Emerald Coast Utilities Authority v. Archroma U.S., Inc.
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-03280 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2021 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Western, 3:21-cv-00225 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 06, 2022 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 10/08 3:47 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: North Carolina Western, 3:21-cv-00225, Emerald Coast Utilities Authority v. Archroma U.S., Inc., as DSC case 2:21-cv-3280-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Western; Case Number 3:21-cv-00225. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
10 | 10
![]() Transfer Order of Judicial Panel MDL transferring case to District of South Carolina, MDL# 2873 (CTO-67). Matter transferred for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Clerk of the Panel, John W. Nichols. (tms) |
|
Case electronically transferred to District of South Carolina. Original electronic file and docket sheet sent. (tms) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/8/2021.] | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Not MDL
Fri 10/08 11:28 AM
Case electronically transferred to District of South Carolina. Original electronic file and docket sheet sent. (tms) |
||
Monday, October 04, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 14, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Monday, September 13, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Tuesday, May 18, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Monday, May 17, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (js) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/8/2021.] |