Colorado District Court
Judge:Nina Y Wang-Mj
Case #: 1:21-cv-02726
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2021
Terminated:Jan 27, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 06, 2022 3:00 AM MDT
Defendant
Jacobsen Brothers Painting, Inc.
Represented By
Hal S. Weitzenfeld
Florin Roebig P.A.
contact info
Chase P. Florin
Florin Roebig P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota
Represented By
Terence M. Ridley
Spencer Fane Llp-Denver
contact info
William Michael Brophy
Spencer Fane Llp-Denver
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, February 23, 2023
26 26 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Case Thu 02/23 10:16 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota. (Brophy, William)
Related: [-]
order Minute Order Thu 02/23 10:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pending before the Court is the Parties'26 "Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice," wherein the Parties jointly stipulate to the dismissal, with prejudice, of all claims against Defendant Jacobsen Brothers Painting, Inc. The Stipulation is self-effectuating pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Clerk of Court is therefore DIRECTED to terminate this action from the Court's docket. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 02/23/2023. Text Only Entry. (nywlc4, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/27 12:37 PM
NOTICE re 22 Minute Order, of Filing Executed Appraisal Protocol Agreement by Plaintiff Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota(Brophy, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Executed Appraisal Protocol Agreement
order Order on Motion for Leave Thu 01/27 3:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Joint Motion to Administratively Close Case Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.221 is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to administratively close this case, subject to reopening for good cause. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/27/2022. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Thu 01/27 4:19 PM
Civil Case Administratively Closed pursuant 24 Order filed 1/27/2022 re:21 Joint Motion to Administratively Close the Case. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
order Minute Order Tue 01/25 8:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER: This action is before the court on the Joint Motion to Administratively Close Case Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2 ("Motion")21 . The Parties attach a copy of the Appraisal Protocol Agreement at issue in the Motion, but the Agreement is not signed or dated. The Parties are hereby DIRECTED to file a signed and dated Agreement by 1/27/2022. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/25/2022. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
21 21 motion Leave Fri 01/21 5:15 PM
Joint MOTION for Leave to ADMINSTRATIVELY CLOSE CASE PURSUANT TO D.C.COLO.LCIVR 41.2 by Plaintiff Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota.(Brophy, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
order Order on Motion for Order Fri 01/21 12:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER: This action is before the court on Plaintiff's Case Status Report19 , wherein Plaintiff requests until 1/21/2022 to submit a "stipulation concerning administrative closure of the case pending the appraisal to be conducted pursuant to the the protocols." Plaintiff's request is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file the stipulation by 1/21/2022. In addition, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2022 at 9:30 AM is hereby RESET for 2/23/2022 at 11:30 AM. The Proposed Scheduling Order is due 2/16/2022. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/21/2022. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
19 19 misc Status Report Tue 01/18 6:08 PM
STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota. (Brophy, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
order Order on Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Fri 01/14 11:16 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge16 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/14/2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
order Minute Order Fri 01/14 12:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the filing of the Consent/Nonconsent Form16 , the Status Conference set for 1/19/2022 at 10:30 AM is hereby VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/14/2022. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
16 16 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Mon 01/10 4:59 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota All parties consent.. (Brophy, William)
Related: [-]
order Minute Order Mon 01/10 11:16 AM
MINUTE ORDER: On November 30, 2021, this court ordered the Parties to file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by December 20, 2021. 11 . That deadline remained unchanged by this court's Order granting in part the Joint Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference and Associated Deadlines, 13 , and the Parties still have yet to file the Consent/Nonconsent Form. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that a Telephonic Status Conference is set for January 19, 2021 at 10:30 AM . The Parties shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. The Status Conference will be vacated upon the filing of a completed Consent/Nonconsent Form. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/10/2022. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
14 14 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 01/04 8:45 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hal S. Weitzenfeld on behalf of Jacobsen Brothers Painting, Inc.Attorney Hal S. Weitzenfeld added to party Jacobsen Brothers Painting, Inc.(pty:dft) (Weitzenfeld, Hal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
12 12 motion Vacate Wed 12/22 12:33 PM
Second MOTION to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference and Associated Deadlines by Plaintiff Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota. (Brophy, William)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Vacate Wed 12/22 5:28 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Joint Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference and Associated Deadlines is hereby GRANTED IN PART. The Scheduling Conference is RESET for 1/24/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. The Proposed Scheduling Order is due 1/17/2022. The deadline to file the Consent Form remains as is. No further extensions will be granted with respect to the Scheduling Conference absent extraordinary circumstances. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/22/2021. Text Only Entry(nywlc3, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
order Order on Motion to Vacate Order on Motion to Reset Tue 11/30 7:35 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The9 Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference and Associated Deadlines is hereby GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference is RESET for 1/3/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. The Proposed Scheduling Order is due 12/27/2021. The Consent/Nonconsent Form is due 12/20/2021. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/30/2021. Text Only Entry(nywlc3, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 26, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Fri 11/26 8:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Relief8 is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before December 17, 2021. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/26/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
9 9 motion Vacate Reset Wed 11/24 3:08 PM
MOTION to Vacate4 Order, , MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference and Associated Deadlines by Plaintiff Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota. (Brophy, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Tue 11/23 4:03 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Relief by Defendant Jacobsen Brothers Painting, Inc.. (Florin, Chase)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 11/23 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Chase P. Florin on behalf of Jacobsen Brothers Painting, Inc.Attorney Chase P. Florin added to party Jacobsen Brothers Painting, Inc.(pty:dft) (Florin, Chase)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 11, 2021
6 6 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Thu 11/11 4:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota. Jacobsen Brothers Painting, Inc. served on 10/25/2021, answer due 11/15/2021. (Ridley, Terence)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/29 10:27 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation for Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota. (Brophy, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
4 4 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/12 12:38 PM
ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent /Non Consent Form, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/12/2021. Consent/Non Consent Form is due by 11/23/2021. A Proposed Scheduling Order due is 11/30/2021. A Scheduling Conference is set for 12/7/2021 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (angar, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
3 3 misc Summons Issued Fri 10/08 3:38 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
2 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/08 3:20 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against Jacobsen Brothers Painting, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8117321)Attorney Terence M. Ridley added to party Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota(pty:pla), filed by Tri-State Insurance Company of Minnesota.(Ridley, Terence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 10/08 3:36 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
Related: [-]