New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Referred: James L Cott
Case #: 1:21-cv-08354
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2021
Terminated:May 05, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 06, 2022 4:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Bronx Park Motel Corp.
Defendant
M.H.J. Motel Corp.
Plaintiff
John Laureano
Represented By
Ben-Zion Bradley Weitz
The Weitz Law Firm, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
34 34 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/09 3:05 PM
JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: COME NOW, Plaintiff, JOHN LAUREANO, and Defendants, BRONX PARK MOTEL CORP., a New York corporation, d/b/a BRONX PARK MOTEL, and M.H.J. MOTEL CORP., a New York corporation, by and through their respective undersigned counsel, and pursuant to a confidential settlement agreement and pursuant to the provisions of Rule 4l(a)(l) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, hereby stipulate to a dismissal of the above- captioned action, with prejudice, with regard to all Defendants. Each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/9/2023) (rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
33 33 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 08/08 5:42 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by John Laureano..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 07/05 10:41 PM
ORDER granting31 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/5/2023) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
31 31 motion Extension of Time Mon 07/03 12:21 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of Dismissal Deadline addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from B. Bradley Weitz, Esq. dated July 3, 2023. Document filed by John Laureano..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 06/05 5:12 PM
ORDER granting29 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/5/2023) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 04, 2023
29 29 motion Extension of Time Sun 06/04 6:36 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of Dismissal Deadline addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from B. Bradley Weitz, Esq. dated June 4, 2023. Document filed by John Laureano..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
28 28 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Fri 05/05 4:33 PM
ORDER: The Court having been advised that court-ordered mediation in this case was held and agreement was reached on all issues, Dkt. 27, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within 30 days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed within 30 days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same 30-day period to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per Paragraph 4(C) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any proposed order approving the settlement agreement that seeks the Court's continued jurisdiction should either (1) expressly state that the Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the agreement or (2) incorporate the terms of the settlement agreement in the order. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/5/2023) (rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Thu 04/20 11:11 AM
SUBSEQUENT MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 4/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(mnp)
Related: [-]
minutes Mediation Conference Thu 04/20 11:11 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before SDNY Mediation: Mediation Conference held on 4/19/2023. Mediation Status due by 5/19/2023. (mnp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
minutes Mediation Conference Mon 03/27 3:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before SDNY Mediation: Mediation Conference held on 3/21/2023. Mediation Status due by 4/20/2023. (mnp)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Mon 03/27 3:17 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 3/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(mnp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Thu 02/23 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 3/27/2023.(ah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
26 26 order Mediation Referral Order Wed 02/15 12:43 PM
MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, at the parties' request, the Court is referring this case involving claims under the Americans with Disabilities Act to mediation under Local Civil Rule 83.9. Mediation shall be scheduled to take place within the next 60 to 90 days, as mutually convenient to counsel, their clients, and the mediator. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in advance of the mediation session: 1) If the parties disagree about injunctive relief, they must exchange documents sufficient to show the nature and details of the alleged access violations to the physical or electronic location, and any defenses to remediation, including any existing expert reports, videos, photographs, or plans; and 2) If the parties disagree about costs or fees, plaintiff shall provide defendant with documentation and support for attorney's fees and costs to date (including expert fees), similar to what would be provided in a motion for fees. The parties are directed to advise the Court as to the status of the case within 7 days of the conclusion of the mediation. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 3/1/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 2/15/2023) (rro)
Related: [-]
25 25 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 02/15 12:39 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A deadline by which the parties may move to amend the pleadings or join any other parties: March 17, 2023. Fact Depositions to be completed by June 15, 2023. A date by which all non-expert discovery shall be completed: June 15, 2023. Joint Pretrial Order due August 29, 2023. Anticipated length of trial and whether, and by whom, a jury has been requested: 2 - 3 days. Defendants request a jury trial. Plaintiff prefers a bench trial. (Deposition due by 7/31/2023., Discovery due by 6/15/2023., Motions due by 3/17/2023., Pretrial Order due by 8/29/2023.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 2/15/2023) (rro)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Tue 02/21 11:38 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott: Pretrial Conference held on 2/15/2023. (Tam, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
24 24 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Mon 02/13 9:49 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by John Laureano..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
23 23 misc Status Report Fri 02/03 3:59 PM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by John Laureano..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
22 22 5 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 01/30 11:53 AM
ORDER FOR CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16: Counsel should contact chambers using the Court's conference line, (877) 873-8017 (Access Code: 5277586). (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/15/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 1/30/2023) (jca)
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs order Order Mon 01/30 11:50 AM
ORDER By order dated October 13, 2021, Judge Engelmayer referred this case to me for general pretrial supervision (Dkt. No. 7). Accordingly, the Court directs the parties to provide a joint status update by February 3, 2023 updating the Court as to the status of the case and if the case has been settled. By separate order the Court will set initial case management conference in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 1/30/2023) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/16 12:42 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Bronx Park Motel Corp., M.H.J. Motel Corp...(McClure, Christopher)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/16 12:38 PM
FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bronx Park Motel Corp., M.H.J. Motel Corp...(McClure, Christopher)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/16 11:39 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Wayne McClure on behalf of Bronx Park Motel Corp., M.H.J. Motel Corp...(McClure, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 03/29 3:18 PM
ORDER granting16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The Court grants plaintiff's third request for an extension to show cause. No further extensions should be expected. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/29/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
16 16 motion Extension of Time Fri 03/25 9:05 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Show Cause addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from B. Bradley Weitz, Esq. dated March 25, 2022. Document filed by John Laureano..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 02/23 12:19 PM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The Court grants a 30-day extension for plaintiff to show cause. At that time, if the defendant has not appeared, plaintiff shall show cause by properly submitting a motion for default judgment, pursuant to the Court's individual rules. Failure to submit a timely and proper motion for default judgment will result in dismissal without prejudice of this case under Rule 41. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/23/2022) (rro)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 21, 2022
14 14 motion Extension of Time Mon 02/21 10:50 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from B. Bradley Weitz, Esq. dated February 21, 2022. Document filed by John Laureano..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 01/21 4:07 PM
ORDER granting12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/21/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
12 12 motion Extension of Time Thu 01/20 8:01 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time To Show Cause addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from B. Bradley Weitz, Esq. dated January 20, 2022. Document filed by John Laureano..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 06, 2022
11 11 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 01/06 4:33 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff shall show cause by January 20, 2022 why the above-captioned action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff may show cause by properly submitting a motion for default judgment, pursuant to the Court's Individual Rules, which requires obtaining a certificate of default issued by the Clerk of Court prior to filing a motion for default judgment. Failure to submit a timely and proper motion for default judgment will result in dismissal without prejudice of this case under Rule 41. SO ORDERED. Show Cause Response due by 1/20/2022. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/06/2022) (ama)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 18, 2021
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Sat 12/18 10:43 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by John Laureano..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Sat 12/18 10:41 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. M.H.J. Motel Corp. served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by John Laureano..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Sat 12/18 10:38 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Bronx Park Motel Corp. served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by John Laureano..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
7 7 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 10/13 1:31 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/13/2021) (va)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 10/12 2:39 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bronx Park Motel Corp...(gp)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 10/12 2:39 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to M.H.J. Motel Corp...(gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 10/12 2:38 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 10/12 2:38 PM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 10/12 2:38 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
4 4 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 10/08 8:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to M.H.J. MOTEL CORP., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by John Laureano..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 10/08 8:24 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRONX PARK MOTEL CORP., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by John Laureano..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 10/08 8:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/08 8:23 PM
COMPLAINT against Bronx Park Motel Corp., M.H.J. Motel Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25175123)Document filed by John Laureano..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
Related: [-]