Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Claude M Hilton
Referred: John F Anderson
Case #: 1:21-cv-01145
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2021
Terminated:May 24, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 06, 2022 4:59 AM EDT
Defendant
John Bamford
Represented By
Ryan Carson Samuel
Arlington County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Heather K. Kiriakou
Represented By
Jonathan Mark Harrison, II
Bean Kinney & Korman PC
contact info
Richard Cyril Sullivan, Jr.
Bean Kinney & Korman PC
contact info
Defendant
Northrup Grumman Corporation
Represented By
Charles B. Wayne
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Ilana Eisenstein
Dla Piper Us Llp (pa-Na)
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Kiriakou
Represented By
Bruce Fein
Fein & Delvalle, Pllc (dc-Na)
contact info
Jonathan Leo Fahey
Tate Bywater
contact info
Travis Downing Tull
Tate Bywater Fuller Mickelsen & Tull PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
42 42 2 pgs order Order Mon 06/06 10:16 AM
ORDERED that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are GRANTED and that this case is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 5/24/2022. (kgall)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
41 41 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Reassign Case Mon 05/16 12:57 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Reassign Case and Consolidate This Action. It isFURTHER ORDERED this matter be consolidated under the lead case Kiriakou v. Bamford et al., No. 1:20-cv-00662-CMH-JFA (E.D. Va.) (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 05/16/2022. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/16 1:01 PM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Claude M. Hilton. District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
40 40 respoth Reply Other Tue 12/21 11:51 AM
Reply to17 Memorandum in Support,16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Northrup Grumman Corporation. (Wayne, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
39 39 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 12/20 9:50 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by John Bamford. (Samuel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 17, 2021
38 38 respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 12/17 3:07 PM
RESPONSE in Support re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Heather K. Kiriakou. (Sullivan, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
utility Remark Thu 12/16 8:46 AM
Per RDA chambers motions set for 12/22/2021 on the pleadings (clar, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
37 37 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 12/14 4:33 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by John C. Kiriakou.(Fahey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
36 36 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 12/14 4:32 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by John C. Kiriakou.(Fahey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
35 35 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 12/14 4:31 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by John C. Kiriakou.(Fahey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
34 34 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/14 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Leo Fahey on behalf of John C. Kiriakou (Fahey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Tue 12/14 12:05 PM
Motion hearing set for December 15, 2021 is cancelled. Ruling will be made on papers. (dvanm, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 09, 2021
33 33 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Thu 12/09 5:57 PM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Ilana Eisenstein for Northrup Grumman Corporation. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 12/09/2021. (jlan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
32 32 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/08 12:38 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ilana Eisenstein and Certification of Local Counsel Charles B. Wayne Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8142237. by Northrup Grumman Corporation. (Wayne, Charles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
31 31 respoth Opposition Wed 12/01 12:18 PM
Opposition to29 Opposition filed by Northrup Grumman Corporation. (Wayne, Charles)
Related: [-]
30 30 respoth Opposition Wed 12/01 12:00 PM
Opposition to28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition filed by John Bamford. (Samuel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
29 29 respoth Opposition Tue 11/23 10:29 AM
Opposition to28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition filed by Heather K. Kiriakou. (Sullivan, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 22, 2021
28 28 motion Extension of Mon 11/22 3:35 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition by John C. Kiriakou. (Tull, Travis)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Notice of Hearing Date Mon 11/22 9:31 AM
Notice of Hearing Date re25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Samuel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
26 26 21 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Mon 11/22 9:30 AM
Memorandum in Support re25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by John Bamford.(Samuel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit
25 25 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/22 9:28 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by John Bamford. (Samuel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/23 10:52 AM
Set Deadlines as to25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (clar, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/18 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Cyril Sullivan, Jr on behalf of Heather K. Kiriakou (Sullivan, Richard)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Notice of Hearing Date Thu 11/18 4:14 PM
Notice of Hearing Date set for 12/22/2021 re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Harrison, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
22 22 21 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Thu 11/18 4:13 PM
Memorandum in Support re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Heather K. Kiriakou.(Harrison, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
21 21 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 11/18 4:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Heather K. Kiriakou. (Harrison, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/18 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Mark Harrison, II on behalf of Heather K. Kiriakou (Harrison, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 11/19 11:18 AM
Set Deadlines as to21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (clar, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Thu 11/18 12:52 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Bruce Fein for John C. Kiriakou. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 11/17/2021. (clar, )
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Notice of Hearing Date Wed 11/17 2:38 PM
Notice of Hearing Date re17 Memorandum in Support,16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. (Wayne, Charles)
Related: [-]
17 17 19 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Wed 11/17 2:37 PM
Memorandum in Support re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Northrup Grumman Corporation. (Wayne, Charles)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 11/17 2:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Northrup Grumman Corporation. (Wayne, Charles)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 11/18 9:42 AM
Set Deadlines as to16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,.. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (clar, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
15 15 3 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition Mon 11/15 4:11 PM
Memorandum , Memorandum in Opposition re11 MOTION to Reassign Case and Consolidate This Action filed by John C. Kiriakou. (Tull, Travis)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/15 4:10 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Bruce Fein and Certification of Local Counsel Travis D. Tull Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8102239. by John C. Kiriakou. (Tull, Travis)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
utility Remark Fri 11/12 1:12 PM
Per RDA chambers motions set for 11/17/2021 on the pleadings (clar, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
13 13 misc Notice of Hearing Date Wed 11/10 12:19 PM
Notice of Hearing Date set for November 17, 2021 re11 MOTION to Reassign Case and Consolidate This Action ,12 Memorandum in Support (Wayne, Charles)
Related: [-]
12 12 6 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Wed 11/10 12:17 PM
Memorandum in Support re11 MOTION to Reassign Case and Consolidate This Action filed by Northrup Grumman Corporation. (Wayne, Charles)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Reassign Case Wed 11/10 12:14 PM
MOTION to Reassign Case and Consolidate This Action by Northrup Grumman Corporation. (Wayne, Charles)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/10 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Wayne on behalf of Northrup Grumman Corporation (Wayne, Charles)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 11/12 8:31 AM
Set Deadlines as to11 MOTION to Reassign Case and Consolidate This Action . Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (clar, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/09 9:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Carson Samuel on behalf of John Bamford (Samuel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/05 10:33 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John C. Kiriakou John Bamford served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021 (Tate, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/05 10:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John C. Kiriakou Northrup Grumman Corporation served on 10/27/2021, answer due 11/17/2021 (Tate, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/05 10:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John C. Kiriakou Heather K. Kiriakou served on 10/28/2021, answer due 11/18/2021 (Tate, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 10/26 10:58 AM
Summons Issued as to John Bamford, Heather K. Kiriakou, Northrup Grumman Corporation, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(dvanm, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Wed 10/13 5:13 PM
Proposed Summons of Northrup Grumman Corporation by John C. Kiriakou. (Tull, Travis)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Wed 10/13 5:12 PM
Proposed Summons of John Bamford by John C. Kiriakou. (Tull, Travis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 10/13 5:11 PM
Proposed Summons of Heather Kiriakou by John C. Kiriakou. (Tull, Travis)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/08 6:30 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8040443.), filed by John C. Kiriakou.(Tull, Travis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 10/12 9:28 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dvanm, )
Related: [-]