Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:S Maurice Hicks, Jr
Referred: Carol B Whitehurst
Case #: 6:21-cv-03565
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Apr 09, 2022 4:04 AM CDT
Defendant
Flowers Foods Inc
Represented By
Calvin Garner Sanford, Jr
Ogletree Deakins Et Al (alt)
contact info
Andrew John Halverson
Ogletree Deakins Et Al (laf)
contact info
Defendant
Flowers Baking Co of Baton Rouge L L C
Represented By
Calvin Garner Sanford, Jr
Ogletree Deakins Et Al (alt)
contact info
Andrew John Halverson
Ogletree Deakins Et Al (laf)
contact info
Plaintiff
Kirby Porter
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
All Plaintiffs
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Zelman
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronnie Trosclair
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Ted Shuff
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Romero
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Quebedeaux
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Lester Prejean
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Aaron Bourque
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Daryl Miller
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Ezekiel Lazard
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Harold Johnson
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Jeffers
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Jared Hebert
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Joey Frederick
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Jake Fontenot
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Duhon
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Dugas
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Casey Dohman
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Cody Desormeaux
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Gerald Breaux
Represented By
David Patrick Keating
Keating Firm
contact info
Lauren Noel Maurer
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Steven G Durio
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Ryan M Goudelocke
Caraway Leblanc
contact info
Travis J Broussard
Law Office Of Travis J Broussard
contact info
Randall M Guidry
Durio Mcgoffin Et Al
contact info
Thomas Moore Hayes, IV
Hayes Harkey Et Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, October 18, 2024
66 66 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Fri 10/18 3:58 PM
ORDER granting65 Motion for Approval of FLSA Settlement. All claims of all plaintiffs are be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 10/18/2024. (crt,Keifer, K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
65 65 motion Settlement Thu 10/17 1:21 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of FLSA by Flowers Foods Inc, Flowers Baking Co of Baton Rouge L L C, All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst.(aty,Sanford, Calvin) Modified to add filers on 10/17/2024 (Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Affidavit and Declaration of Steven Durio,
Att: 3 Proposed order
utility Motions Transferred Thu 10/17 1:42 PM
Motions Transferred regarding65 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of FLSA . Motions referred to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]