Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey L Schmehl
Case #: 5:21-cv-04457
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2021
Terminated:Mar 07, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Apr 09, 2022 4:48 AM EDT
Defendant
STVT-AAI Education, Inc. d/b/a Ancora Education
Represented By
Kira Michele Geary
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
MICHAEL A. PAVLICK
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tamara Smith
Represented By
WILLIAM P. MANSOUR
Mansour Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, March 07, 2022
11 11 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Mon 03/07 4:12 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 3/7/22. 3/7/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 10, 2022
10 10 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 02/10 2:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. A Rule 16 Scheduling Conference was held via telephone on 2/10/22, Not on the record. (dt)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/10 1:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/4/2022 02:30 PM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. DISCOVERY DUE BY 7/10/2022.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 2/10/22. 2/10/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/01 12:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kira Michele Geary on behalf of STVT-AAI Education, Inc. d/b/a Ancora Education with Certificate of Service(Geary, Kira)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 01/03 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MARCH 18, 2022 AT 1:30 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE VIA TELECONFERENCE.(dc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 12/29 10:17 PM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) SHALL BE HELD ON THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 10, 2022 AT 11:30 A.M. COUNSEL SHALL USE DIAL IN NUMBER 888-204-5984 ACCESS CODE 3221457. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: 1. THE PARTIES SHALL MAKE THE REQUIRED INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER FED. R.CIV. P. 26(A) WITHIN 20 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; 2. THE PARTIES SHALL COMMENCE DISCOVERY IMMEDIATELY; 3. AFTER CONSULTATION WITH COUNSEL FOR ALL PARTIES, COUNSEL SHALL COMPLETE AND SUBMIT THE REQUIRED JOINT STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO RULE 26 (F); 4. COUNSEL SHALL FOLLOW JUDGE SCHMEHLS POLICIES AND PROCEDURES WHICH CAN BE FOUND AT WWW.PAED.USCOURTS.GOV. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 12/29/21. 12/29/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Wed 12/29 10:15 PM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR THE PURPOSE OF SCHEDULING AND CONDUCTING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 12/29/21. 12/29/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 23, 2021
4 4 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Thu 12/23 1:44 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by STVT-AAI Education, Inc. d/b/a Ancora Education.(PAVLICK, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/23 1:41 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by STVT-AAI Education, Inc. d/b/a Ancora Education.(PAVLICK, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 11/29 5:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tamara Smith. STVT-AAI Education, Inc. d/b/a Ancora Education waiver sent on 10/26/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (MANSOUR, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
service Summons Issued Wed 10/13 8:11 AM
Summons Issued as to STVT-AAI Education, Inc. d/b/a Ancora Education. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 10/13/21 (bw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 11, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 10/11 3:04 PM
COMPLAINT against STVT-AAI Education, Inc. d/b/a Ancora Education ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15466166.), filed by Tamara Smith.(MANSOUR, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Right to Sue
misc Jury Demand Tue 10/12 2:02 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tamara Smith. (JL )
Related: [-]