District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:James E Boasberg
Case #: 1:21-cv-02669
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2021
Terminated:Jan 31, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Apr 10, 2022 5:05 AM EDT
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Represented By
Daniel Patrick Schaefer
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Defendant
NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
Represented By
Daniel Patrick Schaefer
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Plaintiff
KATHERINE ARRINGTON
Represented By
Mark Steven Zaid
Law Offices Of Mark S. Zaid, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, January 31, 2022
order .Order Mon 01/31 9:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties'14 Stipulation, the Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/31/2022. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 29, 2022
14 14 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Sat 01/29 11:27 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY. (Schaefer, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
order .Order Thu 01/27 9:52 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties'13 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by February 2, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/27/2022. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 01/27 10:16 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/2/2022. (nbn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
13 13 1 pgs misc Status Report Wed 01/26 8:37 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY.(Schaefer, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
12 12 1 pgs misc Status Report Wed 01/19 4:12 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY.(Schaefer, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order .Order Wed 01/19 5:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties'12 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by January 26, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/19/2022. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 01/20 10:19 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/26/2022. (nbn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
order .Order Thu 01/13 9:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties'11 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by January 19, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/13/2022. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 01/13 11:02 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/19/2022. (nbn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
11 11 1 pgs misc Status Report Wed 01/12 9:36 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHERINE ARRINGTON.(Zaid, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, January 06, 2022
order .Order Thu 01/06 11:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties'10 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by January 12, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/6/2022. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 01/10 2:24 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/12/2022. (znbn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
10 10 misc Status Report Wed 01/05 6:17 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY.(Schaefer, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, December 13, 2021
order .Order Mon 12/13 10:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties'9 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by January 5, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/13/2021. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 12/13 10:25 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/5/2022. (znbn)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
9 9 misc Status Report Fri 12/10 7:31 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY.(Schaefer, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 12/01 9:28 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2021 at 11:30 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn)
Related: [-]
order .Order Wed 12/01 11:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER: As agreed by the parties in today's scheduling call, the Court ORDERS that: 1) The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by December 10, 2021; and 2) All deadlines are stayed until further Order of the Court. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/1/2021. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 12/01 12:40 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/1/2021. All deadlines are STAYED until further Order of the Court. Joint Status Report due by 12/10/2021. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (nbn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/30 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of All Defendants (Schaefer, Daniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs motion Preliminary Injunction Permanent Injunction Tue 11/30 1:00 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Permanent Injunction by KATHERINE ARRINGTON.(Zaid, Mark). Added MOTION for Permanent Injunction on 11/30/2021 (zjf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 21 pgs Memorandum in Support Memo of Law,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Clearance Suspension Memo,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Admin Leave Suspension,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3A - May 13, 2021 George & Wall Emails,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3B - May 18, 2021 George Email,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3C - May 19, 2021 George Email,
Att: 7 Exhibit 3D - May 20, 2021 Wall Email,
Att: 8 Exhibit 3E - May 20, 2021 Salazar Email,
Att: 9 3 pgs Exhibit 3F - May 20-21, 2021 DoDOIG Emails,
Att: 10 Exhibit 3G - May 21, 2021 DCSA Email,
Att: 11 Exhibit 3H - May 21, 2021 Salazar & Wall Emails,
Att: 12 Exhibit 3I - May 21, 2021 NSA Email,
Att: 13 Exhibit 3J - May 24, 2021 NSA Email,
Att: 14 Exhibit 3K - May 28, 2021 George Email,
Att: 15 Exhibit 3L - June 29, 2021 DCSA GC Email,
Att: 16 Exhibit 3M - July 12, 2021 Email,
Att: 17 Exhibit 3N - July 14, 2021 CAF Memo & DSCA GC Email,
Att: 18 Exhibit 3O - August 24, 2021 DCSA GC Email,
Att: 19 Exhibit 3P -September 13, 2021 NSA & DCSA Email,
Att: 20 Exhibit 3Q - September 17, 2021 DCSA GC Email,
Att: 21 Exhibit 3R - November 3, 2021 Email,
Att: 22 Exhibit 3S - November 4, 2021 DCSA Email,
Att: 23 Exhibit 3T - November 22, 2021 DCSA Letter,
Att: 24 Exhibit 3U - DISS Incident Report,
Att: 25 Exhibit 3 - Zaid Declaration,
Att: 26 Exhibit 4 - SOR,
Att: 27 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
notice Notice of QC Tue 11/30 3:55 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; emailed to Mark@MarkZaid.com, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. DO NOT REFILE - Counsel is reminded to docket all parts of their filing (zjf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 11, 2021
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/11 12:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against KATHERINE ARRINGTON filed by KATHERINE ARRINGTON.(Zaid, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Thu 10/21 12:00 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KATHERINE ARRINGTON served on 10/21/2021(Zaid, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - USPS Tracking Info
service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Fri 10/22 12:31 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/21/2021. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/21/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/20/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 10/20/2021.(See Docket Entry4 to view document)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 10/18 10:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's2 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Complaint Using Counsel's Office Address. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff is excused from having to list her residential address on the Complaint. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/18/2021. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Thu 10/14 12:09 PM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(adh, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 10/14 11:01 AM
Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
2 2 2 pgs motion Leave to File Document Tue 10/12 1:45 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Using Counsel's Office Address by KATHERINE ARRINGTON.(Zaid, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Declaration Declaration of Mark S. Zaid,
Att: 2 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/12 1:42 PM
COMPLAINT against KATHERINE ARRINGTON ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8793808) filed by KATHERINE ARRINGTON.(Zaid, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons - DoD,
Att: 3 Summons Summons - NSA,
Att: 4 Summons Summons - AG,
Att: 5 Summons Summons - USAO