Florida Middle District Court
Judge:William F Jung
Referred: Thomas G Wilson
Case #: 8:21-cv-02390
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2021
Terminated:Oct 21, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Apr 10, 2022 5:47 AM EDT
Defendant
Emily Peacock
Plaintiff
Lesa Maria Martino
PO Box 320174
Tampa, FL 33679


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, November 01, 2021
15 15 misc Supplement Tue 11/02 9:58 AM
SUPPLEMENT re1 Complaint by Lesa Maria Martino. (MCB)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
14 14 respoth Objection Fri 10/29 4:37 PM
OBJECTION/RESPONSE re 11 Order no pdf. (LNR)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
13 13 service Request for waiver of service Mon 10/25 9:33 AM
REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to Emily Peacock on 10/25/2021 by Lesa Maria Martino. (MCB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
12 12 order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 10/21 12:29 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/21/2021. (Jung, William)
Related: [-]
11 11 order *Order no pdf Thu 10/21 12:27 PM
ENDORSED ORDER dismissing case with prejudice. The Plaintiff sues a sitting 13th Judicial Circuit Judge for judicial acts and rulings that occurred in a civil suit proceeding before the Defendant Judge. The suit is against this state court judge both in her personal capacity and in her official capacity. Judges are absolutely immune from suit in situations such as this, unless the claim is one of judicial acts in the absence of all jurisdiction whatsoever. Here, Judge Peacock is the sitting judge in a civil law suit involving this Plaintiff. There is no cause of action in this regard under 42 U.S.C. 1983 or otherwise - the complaint is not amenable to cure. The Clerk will close this file. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/21/2021. (Jung, William)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Supplement Thu 10/21 11:14 AM
SUPPLEMENT re1 Complaint by Lesa Maria Martino. (ABC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
9 9 misc Supplement Wed 10/20 12:37 PM
SUPPLEMENT re1 Complaint by Lesa Maria Martino.(ABC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit- Motion for hearing on verified amended petition for indirect criminal contempt and order to show cause
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
8 8 order Standing Order Wed 10/13 5:29 PM
STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 10/13 3:21 PM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 10/13 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Proposed summons Wed 10/13 1:21 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Lesa Maria Martino. (ABC)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Supplement Wed 10/13 1:20 PM
SUPPLEMENT re1 Complaint by Lesa Maria Martino.(ABC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Evidence of Misconduct part 1,
Att: 2 Evidence of Misconduct part 2,
Att: 3 Evidence of Misconduct part 3
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
3 3 misc Supplement Wed 10/13 1:16 PM
SUPPLEMENT re1 Complaint by Lesa Maria Martino.(ABC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/12 12:29 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Lesa Maria Martino. (ABC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/12 12:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Emily Peacock with Jury Demand filed by Lesa Maria Martino.(ABC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Transcript June 4 2019 18 CA5020,
Att: 3 Exhibit Transcript Dec 15, 2020,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons