Maryland District Court
Judge:Julie Rebecca Rubin
Case #: 8:21-cv-02597
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2021
Terminated:Jun 14, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 06, 2022 4:56 AM EDT
Defendant
Accreditation Council for Graduate Medical Education
Represented By
Joshua Ferguson
Freeman Mathis And Gary LLP
contact info
Christopher Michael McNally
Bodie Dolina Hobbs Friddell And Grenzer PC
contact info
Defendant
Albany Medical Center Hospital
Represented By
Richard C White
Bond Schoeneck And King PLLC
contact info
Brian A Scotti
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Robert F Manfredo
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Joseph Bartfield
Represented By
Richard C White
Bond Schoeneck And King PLLC
contact info
Brian A Scotti
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Robert F Manfredo
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Federation of State Medical Boards Research and Ed
Represented By
Matthew Stephen Lee Cate
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Chad Russell Bowman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Defendant
Catherine Riddle
Represented By
Richard C White
Bond Schoeneck And King PLLC
contact info
Brian A Scotti
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Robert F Manfredo
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Jeffrey Winseman
Represented By
Richard C White
Bond Schoeneck And King PLLC
contact info
Brian A Scotti
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Robert F Manfredo
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dr. Trevor York
938 East Swan Creek Ste. 108
Fort Washington, MD 20744
Represented By
David A Branch
Law Office Of David A Branch & Associates, PLLC
contact info

GPO Jun 14 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 6/14/2023. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
68 68 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 06/14 12:33 PM
ORDER granting55 Defendants Albany Medical Center Hospital, Dr. Jeffrey Winseman, Dr. Joel Bartfield, and Catherine Riddle's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint; dismissing the Amended Complaint; directing Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 6/14/2023. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
67 67 8 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Wed 06/14 12:28 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 6/14/2023. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
order Order Mon 06/12 4:17 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: An on-the-record proceeding has been scheduled for June 14, 2023, at 12:00 p.m. The purpose of the proceeding will be to issue an oral ruling on the pending Motion to Dismiss at ECF No. 55. There will not be oral argument and the court will issue a written order thereafter in conformity with its oral ruling. In lieu of a written memorandum opinion, the court transcript will be available should the parties wish to have written documentation of the reasoned analysis and supporting authorities for the courts ruling. The parties are welcome to appear in-person or via telephone conference for the proceeding. Those parties who wish to appear remotely should use the following information: Dial-in Number: 1.888.278.0296; Access Code: 7492675. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 6/12/2023. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]