Iowa Southern District Court
Case #: 4:21-cr-00120
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 13, 2021 2:17 AM CDT
Defendant
Darkee Shawn Rouls (1)
Represented By
Joseph D. Herrold
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Andrew James Graeve
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
MacKenzie Benson Tubbs
United States Attorney'S Office - Dsm
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/13/2021 2:25 AM CDT
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
Judge update in case as to Darkee Shawn Rouls. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. (kmp) [4:21-mj-00543-HCA]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT by USA, signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer(R) as to Darkee Shawn Rouls (1). (kmp) [4:21-mj-00543-HCA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Thursday, September 02, 2021
Arrest of Darkee Shawn Rouls. (kmp) [4:21-mj-00543-HCA]
Related: [-]
3 3 TEXT ORDER as to Darkee Shawn Rouls. Initial Appearance set for 9/3/2021 at 03:30 PM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South - Video Proceeding before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Defendant will be present via video from the Polk County Jail. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/2/2021. (k) [4:21-mj-00543-HCA]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
4 4 Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed on 09/01/2021 in case as to Darkee Shawn Rouls. (mrc) [4:21-mj-00543-HCA]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Initial Appearance as to Defendant Darkee Shawn Rouls held on 9/3/2021. Attorney Andrew James Graeve for defendant. Detention and Preliminary Hearings set for 9/10/2021 03:00 PM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South - Video Proceeding before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (mm-mrc) [4:21-mj-00543-HCA]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL as to Darkee Shawn Rouls. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/3/2021. (mrc) [4:21-mj-00543-HCA]
Related: [-]
7 7 RULE 5 ORDER as to Darkee Shawn Rouls. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/3/2021. (mrc) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/3/2021) (mrc). [4:21-mj-00543-HCA]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Darkee Shawn Rouls. (mrc) [4:21-mj-00543-HCA]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION AND SCHEDULING DETENTION AND PRELIMINARY HEARINGS as to Darkee Shawn Rouls. Detention and Preliminary Hearings set for 9/10/2021 at 03:00 PM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South - Video Proceeding before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/3/2021. (mrc) (Main Document 9 replaced on 9/7/2021 to include preliminary hearing) (pll). [4:21-mj-00543-HCA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: FPD Joseph D. Herrold appearing for Darkee Shawn Rouls (Herrold, Joseph) [4:21-mj-00543-HCA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
11 11 Bail/Bond Report (Sealed) as to Darkee Shawn Rouls. (Davidson, Priscilla) [4:21-mj-00543-HCA]
Related: [-]
12 12 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Darkee Shawn Rouls. (Herrold, Joseph) [4:21-mj-00543-HCA]
Related: [-]
13 13 TEXT ORDER as to Darkee Shawn Rouls. Due to Covid protocols at the Polk County Jail, the Preliminary and Detention Hearings are RESET for 9/14/2021 at 02:00 PM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Defendant will be present with counsel in the courtroom Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 9/9/2021. (k) [4:21-mj-00543-HCA]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
Judge update in case as to Darkee Shawn Rouls. Judge Stephanie M. Rose and Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. (mm)
Related: [-]