Marcum v. Preformed Line Products Company
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | P K Holmes III |
Case #: | 5:21-cv-05180 |
Nature of Suit | 751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Oct 13, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Benton County Circuit Court, 04CV-21-02149 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 12, 2022 5:44 AM CDT |
Defendant
Preformed Line Products Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bradley Marcum
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, April 27, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
order
Judgment
Wed 04/27 10:35 AM
JUDGMENT regarding22 Order entered in this case on this date this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 27, 2022. (tg) |
|
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 04/27 10:31 AM
ORDER dismissing case without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's Order. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 27, 2022. (tg) |
|
Tuesday, April 26, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/26 3:19 PM
NOTICE by Bradley Marcum of Order to Withdraw(Schuldt, Renee) |
|
Att: 1 Correspondence | ||
Thursday, March 17, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 03/17 4:17 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Renee Samara Schuldt withdrawn, and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove her name from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. The deadline for plaintiff's new attorney to file a notice of appearance or plaintiff's response to this order is April 15, 2022. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 17, 2022. (lgd) Modified text on 3/17/2022 (jas) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 03/17 11:59 AM
Second MOTION of Renee S. Schuldt to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Bradley Marcum. (Schuldt, Renee) |
|
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 03/17 9:51 AM
ORDER denying17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (See Order for Specifics). Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 17, 2022. (lgd) |
|
Wednesday, March 16, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 03/16 9:09 AM
MOTION of Renee S. Schuldt to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Bradley Marcum. (Schuldt, Renee) |
|
Thursday, December 02, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
order
Final Scheduling Order
Thu 12/02 12:58 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 9/26/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on December 2, 2021. (jas) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Thu 12/02 11:46 AM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Preformed Line Products Company. (Madison, Eva) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/02 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eva C. Madison on behalf of Preformed Line Products Company. (Madison, Eva) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Thu 12/02 11:00 AM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Bradley Marcum. (Schuldt, Renee) |
|
Monday, November 15, 2021 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 11/15 9:47 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Margaret Benson withdrawn, and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove her name from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on November 15, 2021. (hfh) |
||
Friday, November 12, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 11/12 4:52 PM
MOTION of Maggie Benson to Withdraw as Attorney by Preformed Line Products Company. (Benson, Margaret) |
|
Monday, October 18, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Mon 10/18 3:47 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/24/2021. Jury Trial set for 9/26/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on October 18, 2021. (jas) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 10/18 3:39 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint by Preformed Line Products Company.(Benson, Margaret) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/18 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Ryder Wentz on behalf of Preformed Line Products Company. (Wentz, Amy) |
|
Wednesday, October 13, 2021 | ||
7 | 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Amy Wentz is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on October 13, 2021. (jas) | |
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 10/13 1:15 PM
MOTION for Attorney Amy Wentz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2475667) by Preformed Line Products Company. (Benson, Margaret) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Filed by Attorney
Wed 10/13 1:13 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Preformed Line Products Company. (Benson, Margaret) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Wed 10/13 11:04 AM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/13 10:58 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Preformed Line Products Company, filed by Bradley Marcum.(lgd) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 10/13 10:57 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Benton County Circuit Court, case number 04CV 21-2149 , filed by Preformed Line Products Company.(lgd) |
|
Att: 1 24 pgs State Court Complaint documents | ||
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 10/13 10:52 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Preformed Line Products Company. (lgd) |
|
notice
Clerk's Notice Regarding Attorney Registration
Wed 10/13 11:00 AM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorney(s) listed on Complaint3 is (are) not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas: Renee S. Schuldt . An attorney can register through PACER for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (lgd) |
||
notice
Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee
Wed 10/13 11:01 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee:2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days. If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 10/15/2021 (lgd) |
||
misc
Filing Fee Submitted
Wed 10/13 12:56 PM
Notice of Removal filing fee paid re2 Notice of Removal : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2475649.. (Benson, Margaret) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 10/13 1:18 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Amy Wentz is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on October 13, 2021. (jas) |