Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-01442
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 12, 2022 7:32 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
2345 Rice Street Suite 230
Roseville, MN 55113
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
Richard Posey
Represented By
JOEL LEE DILORENZO
The Dilorenzo Law Firm - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, October 14, 2021
2 2 misc Docket Annotation Thu 10/14 3:04 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/13 3:24 PM
COMPLAINT Richard Posey against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6459563.), filed by Richard Posey. (DILORENZO, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet