City of Ruston v. 3M Company, The
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-03333 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 13, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 12, 2022 5:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Ruston
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Kathleen Borland, City of Eau Claire, City of Scottsdale, City of Coral Springs, City of Plant City, City of South Gate, City of Monroe, City of Ruston, City of Natchitoches, County Of Moore, City of Prescott, Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans, California Water Service Company, City of Shreveport, Connecticut Water Company, South Adams County Water and Sanitation District, City of San Jose California, City of Benwood, City of Lake Charles, City of Burbank, City of Adelanto, City of Plantation, County of San Joaquin, City of Watertown, City of Mansfield, Town of Prescott Valley, City of Loxley, Immokalee Water & Sewer District, Sacramento County, City of Fairborn, Alameda County Water District, City of Lathrop, City of Zephyrhills, City of Pompano Beach, City of Clovis, Howard County Maryland, Pasco County, City of Toledo.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Summy, Scott) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, November 15, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corp, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, October 13, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 10/13 4:23 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), City of Ruston v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-3333-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Western Louisiana (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10122203.), filed by City of Ruston. Service due by 1/11/2022(sshe, ) |