Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Charles M Walker
Case #: 1:21-bk-03137
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2021
Dismissed:Feb 01, 2022
Terminated:Apr 01, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Krypton Builders LLC
7015 Pond Ln
Bon Aqua, TN 37025-9724
Represented By
Denis Graham (Gray) Waldron
Dunham Hildebrand, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE 701 BROADWAY STE 318
NASHVILLE, TN 37203


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 12:03 PM CDT
Friday, April 01, 2022
31 31 order Final Decree Chapter 11 Fri 04/01 11:37 AM
Final Decree Issued. Chapter 11 case is closed. IT IS ORDERED that the trustee, if one was appointed, is discharged as trustee of this estate. Signed on 4/1/2022. (anm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 28, 2022
30 30 trustee Ch. 11 Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution C-case dism or conv, fee award not recd Mon 02/28 2:39 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $0.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Applicable, Assets Exempt: Not Applicable, Claims Scheduled: $320965.22, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Applicable. (STONE, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 02/03 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 02/03/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Section 1112(b) - BK Order
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
28 28 order Dismiss Case under Section 1112(b) - BK Order Tue 02/01 4:44 PM
Order Granting Debtor's Motion To Dismiss Case under Section 1112(b) for Debtor Krypton Builders LLC. Related [+] BY THE COURT: Judge Charles M. Walker. (kmw)
Related: [-] f Doc #23
Friday, January 28, 2022
27 27 misc Submitted Order Fri 01/28 10:19 AM
Submitted Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Case Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Krypton Builders LLC. (Waldron, Denis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
26 26 misc Operating Report Wed 01/19 1:11 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period (Month Ending) 12/31/2021 . Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Krypton Builders LLC. (Waldron, Denis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 01/12 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 01/12/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Hearing
Monday, January 10, 2022
24 24 notice 1- Notice of Hearing Mon 01/10 2:16 PM
Notice of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Case under Section 1112(b) - BK Motion. Hearing scheduled 1/26/2022 at 11:00 AM; via Zoom video for Nashville; For details please see www.tnmb.uscourts.gov. Related [+] (lel)
Related: [-] 23
23 23 motion Dismiss Case under Section 1112(b) - BK Motion Mon 01/10 2:07 PM
Debtor's Motion to Dismiss Case under Section 1112(b) Certificate of Service mailed on 1/10/2022. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Krypton Builders LLC. (Waldron, Denis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
22 22 misc Operating Report Tue 12/14 2:50 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period (Month Ending) November 2021 . Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Krypton Builders LLC. (Waldron, Denis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 11/24 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 11/24/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Application to Employ - BK Order
20 20 misc Subchapter V - Pre-Status Conference Report - Ch 11 Subchapter V Wed 11/24 5:03 PM
Debtor's Pre-Status Conference Report for CH 11 Subchapter V . Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Krypton Builders LLC Related [+]. (Waldron, Denis)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, November 22, 2021
19 19 court Meeting of Creditors Held Mon 11/22 5:07 PM
Meeting of Creditors Held as scheduled on 11/22/21 for Krypton Builders LLC Related [+]. (SELIBER, MEGAN)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Employ - BK Order Mon 11/22 11:20 AM
Order Granting Debtor's Application to Employ and to Retain Dunham Hildebrand, PLLC as Counsel for the Debtor Related [+] ( Related Doc #11 ), BY THE COURT: Judge Charles M. Walker. (kmw)
Related: [-] Ref Doc #10
Friday, November 19, 2021
17 17 misc Submitted Order Fri 11/19 10:56 AM
Submitted Order Approving Employment and Retention of Dunham Hildebrand, PLLC as Counsel for the Debtor Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Krypton Builders LLC Related [+]. (Waldron, Denis)
Related: [-] 10 ,11
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
16 16 misc Operating Report Wed 11/17 10:25 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period (Month Ending) 10/31/2021 (partial) . Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Krypton Builders LLC. (Waldron, Denis)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice Mon 11/15 4:21 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002 Filed on the behalf of: Creditor TN Dept of Revenue. (MCCORMICK, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice Mon 11/08 3:40 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002 Filed on the behalf of: Creditor Precision Garage Door Service of Nashville LLC. (MARCHETTI, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice Fri 11/05 1:45 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002 Filed on the behalf of: Creditor Olert Engineering, Inc.. (IRVIN, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 04, 2021
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice Thu 11/04 2:45 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002 Filed on the behalf of: Creditor Specialty Electric Company, LLC. (RUSNAK, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
court Meeting of Creditors Continued Thu 11/04 5:13 PM
US Trustee's Meeting of Creditors Continued - shall file Certificate of Service for all creditors who have not supplied an email address to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court. Please dial 877-934-2472 and enter code 8613356#. Contact Megan Seliber at 615-695-4060 or megan.seliber@usdoj.gov with questions. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 11/22/2021 at 01:30 PM. ; Refer to www.tnmb.uscourts.gov for details (Nashville). (SELIBER, MEGAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
11 11 misc Amended Document Mon 10/25 4:33 PM
Amended document Notice of Amendment to Verified Statement and Motion to Approve Retention of Dunham Hildebrand, PLLC as Counsel for Debtor : Related [+]. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Krypton Builders LLC. (Waldron, Denis)
Related: [-] Debtor's Application and Notice to Employ Dunham Hildebrand, PLLC as Attorney. If timely response hearing will be held 11/19/2021 at 11:00 AM; via Zoom video for Nashville; For details please see www.tnmb.uscourts.gov. Responses due by 11/12/2021. Certificate of Service mailed on 10/22/2021. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Krypton Builders LLC.10
Friday, October 22, 2021
10 10 motion Employ - BK Motion Fri 10/22 5:48 PM
Debtor's Application and Notice to Employ Dunham Hildebrand, PLLC as Attorney. If timely response hearing will be held 11/19/2021 at 11:00 AM; via Zoom video for Nashville; For details please see www.tnmb.uscourts.gov. Responses due by 11/12/2021. Certificate of Service mailed on 10/22/2021. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Krypton Builders LLC. (Waldron, Denis)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 16, 2021
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 10/16 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 10/16/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 CH 11 Subchapter V Status Conference - BK Order (SA)
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 10/16 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 10/16/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Subchapter V
Thursday, October 14, 2021
7 7 order CH 11 Subchapter V Status Conference Hearing - BK Order (SA) Thu 10/14 4:21 PM
Order and Notice for CH 11 Small Business Subchapter V Status Conference Set . CH 11 Subchapter V Status Conference scheduled 12/8/2021 at 11:00 AM; Refer to www.tnmb.uscourts.gov for details (Nashville). Pre-Status Report Due By 11/24/2021. Signed on 10/14/2021. (kmw)
Related: [-]
6 6 trustee Notice - Chapter 11 DIP Initial UST Conf Thu 10/14 11:39 AM
Notice - Debtor(s) Initial Conference will be held on 10/19/21 at 1:30 P.M. (SELIBER, MEGAN)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Subchapter V - Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee Thu 10/14 11:34 AM
US Trustee's Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee and Subchapter V Trustee's Vertified Statement . WILLIAM TIMOTHY STONE added to the case. (SELIBER, MEGAN)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice Thu 10/14 11:20 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002 Filed on the behalf of: U.S. Trustee US TRUSTEE. (SELIBER, MEGAN)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Subchapter V Thu 10/14 9:45 AM
Meeting of Creditors Meeting of Creditors to be held on 11/12/2021 at 09:00 AM. Refer to www.tnmb.uscourts.gov for details on the remote meeting. Last day to File Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 1/11/2022. Deadline to file Proof of Claim is 12/13/2021. (ko)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Payment Wed 10/13 1:20 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(1:21-bk-03137) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt number 17238618. Fee amount $ 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 35 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 10/13 12:31 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount is $1738.00. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 01/11/2022. (Waldron, Denis)
Related: [-]