Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-01478
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 12, 2022 6:43 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
PRECIOUS MCNEIL
Represented By
ROOPAL P LUHANA
Chaffin Luhana Llp - New York Ny
contact info
STEVEN DANIEL COHN
Chaffin Luhana Llp - New York Ny
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, January 31, 2022
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/31 4:47 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by PRECIOUS MCNEIL. (COHN, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/15 2:39 PM
Corrected Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by PRECIOUS MCNEIL. (LUHANA, ROOPAL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/14 2:36 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6466642.), filed by PRECIOUS MCNEIL. (COHN, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet