Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-01483
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 12, 2022 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
KEWASKI JACKSON
Represented By
STEVEN DANIEL COHN
Chaffin Luhana Llp - New York Ny
contact info
ROOPAL P LUHANA
Chaffin Luhana Llp - New York Ny
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, January 31, 2022
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/31 3:40 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by KEWASKI JACKSON. (COHN, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/15 2:19 PM
Corrected Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by KEWASKI JACKSON. (LUHANA, ROOPAL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/14 3:04 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6467144.), filed by KEWASKI JACKSON. (COHN, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet