Radar Sports Management, LLC v. Legacy Lacrosse, LI Inc et. al.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Wicks |
Referred: | James M Wicks |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-05749 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 03, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 12, 2022 7:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
Michael Brennan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tracey Cantabene
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jake Dean
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mike Gabel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cabel Maddux
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Madlax Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas Zummo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Legacy Lacrosse, LI Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
True Lacrosse
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Radar Sports Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, November 03, 2023 | ||
70 | 70
1
pgs
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 11/03 12:14 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff Radar Sports Management, LLC take nothing of Defendants Legacy Lacrosse, LI, Inc., Madlax, Inc., True Lacrosse, Michael Brennan, Tracey Cantabene, Thomas Zummo, Mike Gabel, Cabel Maddux, and Jake Deane; that Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted; that Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice and without the right to replead; and that this case is closed. Ordered by Clerk of Court on 11/3/2023. (JT) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2023 | ||
69 | 69
25
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 11/02 5:11 PM
OPINION AND ORDER re63 Motion to Dismiss. As set forth in the attached Opinion and Order, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice and without the right to replead. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 11/2/2023. (DF) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2023 | ||
68 | 68
minutes
Motion Hearing
Wed 11/01 12:49 PM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks: CIVIL CAUSE FOR MOTION HEARING. Counsel for Plaintiff: John F. Clennan. Counsel for Defendants (Legacy Lacrosse, LI Inc, Madlax Inc, Michael Brennan, Tracey Cantabene, Thomas Zummo, Cabel Maddux): Annemarie Susan Jones. Counsel for Defendants (True Lacrosse, Mike Gabel, Jake Dean): Jennifer E. Sherven. Motion Hearing/Oral Argument held on 11/1/2023 at 10:00 AM regarding Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint (ECF No.63 ). Parties' arguments were heard. The decision was reserved. The Court will issue a written decision. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. (FTR Log #10:00-10:23 (FTR).) (DF) |