Case Filed:Oct 14, 2021
Dismissed:Apr 18, 2022
Terminated:May 03, 2022

Debtor
American Hotel Register Company
100 South Milwaukee Avenue
Vernon Hills, IL 60061
Represented By
American Hotel Register Company
contact info
Last checked: never
Petitioning Creditor
Scribe Opco, Inc.
14421 Myerlake Circle
Clearwater, FL 33769
Represented By
Marc S Lichtman
Lichtman Eisen Partners, Ltd.
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
SLFAQ LLC
670 White Plains Road PH Floor
Scarsdale, NY 10583
Represented By
Marc S Lichtman
Lichtman Eisen Partners, Ltd.
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
The Winsford Company LLC dba Forbes Industries
1933 E. Locust Street
Ontario, CA 91761
Represented By
Marc S Lichtman
Lichtman Eisen Partners, Ltd.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 10/15/2021 12:03 AM CDT
Thursday, October 14, 2021
1 1 4 pgs misc Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 10/14 12:09 PM
Chapter 7 Involuntary Petition Against a Non-Individual Fee Amount $338 Re: American Hotel Register Company Filed by Petitioning Creditors(s): Scribe Opco, Inc. (attorney Marc S Lichtman), SLFAQ LLC (attorney Marc S Lichtman), The Winsford Company LLC dba Forbes Industries (attorney Marc S Lichtman) (Lichtman, Marc)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 10/14 12:12 PM
Receipt of Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 21-11733 ) [misc,invol7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A44000239. Fee Amount $ 338.00 (Lichtman, Marc) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1