New York Western District Court
Judge:Charles J Siragusa
Referred: Jonathan W Feldman
Case #: 6:14-cv-06459
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause28:7402 Refund of Taxes
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2014
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2015 2:26 PM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Steven Dean
U. S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher C. Phillips
4154 North Road
Geneseo, NY 14454
Represented By
Peter K. Skivington
Jones & Skivington
contact info
Plaintiff
Victoria M. Phillips
4154 North Road
Geneseo, NY 14454
Represented By
Peter K. Skivington
Jones & Skivington
contact info


Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago
Thursday, June 25, 2015
10 10 order Stipulation and Order Thu 06/25 1:41 PM
-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 6/25/15. (KAP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2015
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 06/23 4:23 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by United States of America. (Dean, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2015
8 8 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 04/16 12:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman: Scheduling Conference held on 4/15/2015. The Court will issue an order setting forth various deadlines. Peter Skivington, Esq.; Steven Dean, Esq. by telephone. (PR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 08, 2015
notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/08 4:26 PM
NOTICE per letter-request received by counsel for United States of America, defendant is allowed to participate in the Rule 16 scheduling conference by phone. Defendant's counsel is instructed to call chambers of the Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman at 595-613-4070 on April 15, 2015. (NNR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 01, 2015
7 7 discov Discovery Plan Wed 04/01 4:25 PM
DISCOVERY PLAN by United States of America.(Dean, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2015
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/18 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter K. Skivington on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Skivington, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 27, 2015
5 5 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/27 11:46 AM
ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2015 11:00 AM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 2/27/15. (NNR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 10, 2015
4 4 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 02/10 12:51 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. The Magistrate Judge is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. All non-dispositive motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 2/10/15. (KJA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 29, 2015
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/29 12:05 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by United States of America.(Dean, Steven)
Related: [-]
adr ADR Plan Fri 01/30 11:02 AM
ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(BK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 06, 2015
2 2 order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys ~Util - Update Answer Due Date Tue 01/06 11:26 AM
LETTER ORDER granting defendant's request for extension of time to answer. Attorney Steven Dean for United States of America added. Answer due date updated as to United States of America answer due 2/2/2015. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 1/6/15. (KAP)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 08, 2014
1 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Christopher C. Phillips, Victoria M. Phillips.(BK)
Related: [-]
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/AO085.pdf. (BK)
Related: [-]
Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ROC007396. (BK)
Related: [-]
Summons Issued as to United States of America. (BK)
Related: [-]
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. A copy of the list of Mediators and the ADR Plan has been mailed to the Plaintiff.(BK)
Related: [-]