Nevada District Court
Judge:Cristina D Silva
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:21-cv-01910
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2021
Terminated:Nov 02, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 13, 2022 2:31 AM PDT
Defendant
Michelle Pelino
Defendant
Paya Patel
Defendant
Steven B. Wolfson
Defendant
Eighth Judicial Family Court Las Vegas
Defendant
Child Family Services Las Vegas
Defendant
Stephanie Charter
Defendant
Adriana Rincon White
Defendant
Beth Rosenblum
Defendant
Stephanie Ricther
Defendant
Nick Petas
Defendant
Sheriff Joe Lombardo
Defendant
Belinda T. Harris
Defendant
S Guerra
Defendant
Tisha Evans
Defendant
Nicholas Eason
Defendant
P Anderson
Defendant
Shalonda Adams
Plaintiff
Sade Renee El
5370 East Craig Road Unit 2173
Las Vegas, NV 89115


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, November 03, 2022
24 24 1 pgs order Judgment Thu 11/03 8:42 AM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants Stephanie Ann Charter, Steven B. Wolfson, Stephanie Ricther, Eighth Judicial Family Court Las Vegas, S Guerra, P Anderson, Adriana Rincon White, Belinda T. Harris, Nicholas Eason, Michelle Pelino, Joe Lombardo, Beth Rosenblum, Nick Petas, Tisha Evans, Shalonda Adams, Paya Patel, Dydia Garcia, and against Plaintiff Sade Renee El with prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 11/3/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
23 23 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Order Dismissing Case Wed 11/02 3:58 PM
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion to extend [ECF No.21 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. No other documents may be filed in this now-closed case. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 11/2/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
22 22 11 pgs cmp Complaint Amended Thu 09/29 1:24 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Sade Renee El. No changes to parties. (KF) Modified title to SECOND amended complaint on 9/29/2022 (DRS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 93 pgs Exhibits,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 17 pgs Jury Trial Demand
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
21 21 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Tue 09/06 2:21 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to Answer (Second Request) re16 Report and Recommendation, by Plaintiff Sade Renee El. Responses due by 9/20/2022. (KF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
minord Minute Order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Fri 09/02 1:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/2/2022. Re: 19 Motion to extend time. Having reviewed Plaintiff's motion to extend time, the Court finds good cause to grant the requested extension. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to extend 19 is GRANTED. Because Plaintiff lives where mail takes longer to reach her, the Court grants an additional extension on its own. Plaintiff shall have until September 9, 2022 to file her amended complaint. The Clerk of Court is kindly directed to mail a copy of this minute order to Plaintiff. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
18 18 2 pgs misc Mail Returned Tue 08/23 10:24 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re16 Report and Recommendation, addressed to Sade Renee El. (TRW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
17 17 5 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendation Tue 08/16 3:06 PM
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge Albregt's Report and Recommendation (ECF No.11 ) is ADOPTED in its entirety. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge Albregt's Report and Recommendation (ECF No.16 ) is ADOPTED in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No. 15 ) is STRICKEN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, to the extent Plaintiff can cure the deficiencies identified in both Report and Recommendations (ECF Nos.11 and16 ), Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint within 14 days of this Order. Failure to file an amended complaint or the filing of an amended complaint containing the same deficiencies as the prior two complaints will result in this action being dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 8/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
16 16 3 pgs motion Report and Recommendation Wed 07/27 11:57 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs amended complaint (ECF No.15 ) be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff be given leave to file a third amended complaint to the extent she believes she can cure the noted deficiencies. Objections to R&R due by 8/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
15 15 133 pgs cmp Complaint Amended Tue 06/07 2:59 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Shalonda Adams, P Anderson, Stephanie Charter, Nicholas Eason, Eighth Judicial Family Court Las Vegas, Tisha Evans, Dydia Garcia, S Guerra, Belinda T. Harris, Joe Lombardo, Paya Patel, Michelle Pelino, Nick Petas, Stephanie Ricther, Beth Rosenblum, Adriana Rincon White, Steven B. Wolfson by Sade Renee El. No changes to parties. (KF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
minord Minute Order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Tue 05/24 10:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/24/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs12 Motion to Extend Time to respond is GRANTED. Plaintiff must file any objections to the Report and Recommendation (R&R) on or before June 3, 2022. If Plaintiff intends to file an Amended Complaint to cure the defects identified in the R&R, it shall be filed on or before June 3, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file their updated address with the Clerk of the Court by June 3, 2022. Local Rule of Practice IA 3-1, a pro se party must immediately file with the Court written notification of any change of mailing address, email address, telephone number, or facsimile number. The notification must include proof of service on each opposing party or the partys attorney. Failure to comply with this rule may result in the dismissal of the action, entry of default judgment, or other sanctions as deemed appropriate by the court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF. Minute Order distributed by mail to Pro se Plaintiff - JLB)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
13 13 misc Mail Returned Mon 05/23 12:51 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 9 Clerks Notice Reassign Judge, addressed to Sade Renee El. (KF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
12 12 4 pgs motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Tue 05/17 1:25 PM
MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Answer by Plaintiff Sade Renee El. (KF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
11 11 8 pgs motion Report and Recommendation Fri 04/29 1:56 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs claims brought under 18 U.S.C. § 241, 18 U.S.C. § 242, 18 U.S.C. § 1512, and 18 U.S.C. § 2071 be dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Eighth Judicial District Court, Judge Stephanie Charter, Clark County District Attorney Steve Wolfson, Judge Belinda T. Harris, Hearing Master Adriana Rincon White, and Clerk of Court Steve Gierson be dismissed from this action with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs claims brought under 42 U.S.C. S 1985(3) be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs unreasonable search and seizure, unlawful arrest, and due process violation claims be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff be given leave to file a second amended complaint to the extent she believes she can cure the noted deficiencies. Objections to R&R due by 5/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/29/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
10 10 notice Notice Change of Address Mon 04/18 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Sade Renee El. New address: 9308 South Chicago Ave. #491, Chicago, IL 60617. (HAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
notice Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Thu 04/14 10:57 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE that in order to create a caseload for U.S. District Judge Cristina D. Silva, this case is reassigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:21-cv-01910-CDS-DJA . (no image attached) (ABG)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Notes Thu 04/14 3:29 PM
***Notes: Received a call from pro se Plaintiff. A Notice of Change of Address will be mailed to the Court tomorrow, 4/15/2022. (DRS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
8 8 misc Mail Returned Tue 03/08 8:10 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re6 Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis addressed to Sade Renee El. (KF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
7 7 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 02/11 4:30 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sade Renee El. (KF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Screening Order Fri 01/28 8:20 AM
SCREENING ORDER Denying4 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is further Ordered that the Plaintiff will have until 2/10/2022 to pay the $402 filing fee or submit a completed IFP application. Plaintiff is advised that failure to comply with this Order will result in a recommendation to the District Judge that her case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/27/2022. (Copy of Order and IFP application/instructions sent to P) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
5 5 18 pgs cmp Complaint Amended Mon 01/10 10:13 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Shalonda Adams, P Anderson, Stephanie Charter, Child Family Services Las Vegas, Nicholas Eason, Eighth Judicial Family Court Las Vegas, Tisha Evans, S Guerra, Belinda T. Harris, Joe Lombardo, Paya Patel, Michelle Pelino, Nick Petas, Stephanie Ricther, Beth Rosenblum, Adriana Rincon White, Steven B. Wolfson by Sade Renee El. No changes to parties. (KF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter
4 4 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 01/10 10:09 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sade Renee El. (KF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
3 3 2 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 12/22 4:40 PM
ORDER Denying1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice. Plaintiff shall either pay the filing fee in full or file a proper Application for IFP on or before 1/5/2022. (Forms enclosed) Amended Complaint deadline is also set for 1/5/2022. See Order for full detail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, Non-Inmate IFP enclosed - DRS)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Mon 10/18 10:23 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MR)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
1 1 6 pgs motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 10/18 10:20 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sade Renee El. (MR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 10/15 4:03 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DRS)
Related: [-]