Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Mark H Cohen
Case #: 1:21-cv-04303
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2021
Terminated:Feb 09, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 12, 2022 4:59 AM EDT
Defendant
GE Power
Defendant
GE PowerServices Engineering
Defendant
General Electric Company
Defendant
General Electric International, Inc.
Defendant
Various John Doe Corporations
Plaintiff
Various Insurers, Reinsurers, Retrocessionaires
Represented By
Jonathan Kramer
Fields Howell LLP
contact info
Michael Tricarico
Carroll Mcnulty & Kull, Llc-Ny
contact info
Christopher Robert Carroll
Carroll Mcnulty & Kull, Llc-Nj
contact info
Thomas C. Kaufman
Kennedys Cmk Llp-Ny
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
12 12 misc Judgment - Clerk Wed 02/09 4:24 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action for failure to timely effectuate service and for failure to comply with a court order. (dob)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/09 4:14 PM
ORDER dismissing without prejudice for failure to timely effectuate service and for failure to comply with a lawful order of this Court. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 2/9/2022. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 02/09 4:27 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (dob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 02/03 8:08 AM
Submission of10 Order to Show Cause, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (dob)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
10 10 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 01/19 11:18 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE if any there be, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order why this Court should not dismiss this case without prejudice for failure to effectuate service pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 1/19/2022. (dob)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 19, 2021
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Fri 11/19 10:52 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:9 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher R. Carroll Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Christopher Robert Carroll added appearing on behalf of Various Insurers, Reinsurers, Retrocessionaires (gas)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/19 11:05 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher R. Carroll by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on November 19, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
9 9 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/18 10:23 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher R. Carroll Pro Hac Vice.by Various Insurers, Reinsurers, Retrocessionaires. (Kramer, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Thu 11/18 10:14 AM
RETURN of8 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher R. Carroll Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11394713). to attorney for correction re: petitioners firm name is not listed. (cdg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/16 7:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas Craig Kaufman; and granting7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Joseph Tricarico by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on November 16, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
8 8 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/15 9:07 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher R. Carroll Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11394713).by Various Insurers, Reinsurers, Retrocessionaires. (Kramer, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Mon 11/15 3:17 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:6 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Joseph Tricarico Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11393119). Attorney Michael Tricarico added appearing on behalf of Various Insurers, Reinsurers, Retrocessionaires (gas)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Mon 11/15 3:18 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:7 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas Craig Kaufman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11393198). Attorney Thomas C. Kaufman added appearing on behalf of Various Insurers, Reinsurers, Retrocessionaires (gas)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
7 7 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/12 2:55 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas Craig Kaufman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11393198).by Various Insurers, Reinsurers, Retrocessionaires. (Kramer, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/12 2:47 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Joseph Tricarico Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11393119).by Various Insurers, Reinsurers, Retrocessionaires. (Kramer, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
5 5 misc Letter re:83.1 Fri 11/05 4:44 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Michael Tricarico. Clerk to follow-up by 11/15/2021. (nmb)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Letter re:83.1 Fri 11/05 4:43 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Christopher Robert Carroll. Clerk to follow-up by 11/15/2021. (nmb)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Letter re:83.1 Fri 11/05 4:43 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Thomas C. Kaufman. Clerk to follow-up by 11/15/2021. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Fri 10/15 1:39 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/15/2021. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
1 1 33 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/15 10:30 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11328184) filed by Various Insurers, Reinsurers, Retrocessionaires.(vs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet