Childrens Place Inc v. Zurich American Ins Co
Original Case: 2:20-cv-07980
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-02905 |
Type | civil / private / diversity |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Oct 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 07, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Feb 08, 2024 3:57 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE GROUP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE CO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHILDRENS PLACE INC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/08/2024 3:57 AM EST |
Friday, October 15, 2021 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Childrens Place Inc in District Court No. 2-20-cv-07980. (CJG) | ||
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court Order 9/17/21 | ||
Att: 3 16 pgs District Court Opinion 9/17/21 | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
2 pgs ORDER (Clerk) staying the appeal pursuant to the Court's order consolidating several similar appeals. This stay does not apply to certain case-opening obligations. See order for details. (CJG) |