Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34054

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:21-ap-03076
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2021

Debtor
Highland Capital Management, L.P.

,
Represented By
Zachery Z. Annable
Hayward PLLC
contact info
Melissa S. Hayward
Hayward PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Defendant
CPCM, LLC
Attn: Frances A. Smith 700 N. Pearl Street Suite 1610
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
CPCM, LLC
contact info
Defendant
SAS ASSET RECOVERY, LTD
Represented By
SAS ASSET RECOVERY, LTD
contact info
Defendant
MASSAND CAPITAL, INC.
Represented By
MASSAND CAPITAL, INC.
contact info
Defendant
MASSAND CAPITAL, LLC
Represented By
MASSAND CAPITAL, LLC
contact info
Defendant
RAND PE FUND I, LP, SERIES 1
Represented By
RAND PE FUND I, LP, SERIES 1
contact info
Defendant
Highland Dallas Foundation, Inc.
Represented By
Highland Dallas Foundation, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Charitable DAF Fund, LP
Represented By
Charitable DAF Fund, LP
contact info
Defendant
CLO HOLDCO, LTD.; CHARITABLE DAF HOLDCO, LTD.
Represented By
CLO HOLDCO, LTD.; CHARITABLE DAF HOLDCO, LTD.
contact info
Defendant
MARK & PAMELA OKADA FAMILY TRUST EXEMPT TRUST #2 AND LAWRENCE TONOMURA IN HIS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE OF MARK & PAMELA OKADA FAMILY TRUST EXEMPT TRUST #2
Represented By
MARK & PAMELA OKADA FAMILY TRUST EXEMPT TRUST #2 AND LAWRENCE TONOMURA IN HIS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE OF MARK & PAMELA OKADA FAMILY TRUST EXEMPT TRUST #2
contact info
Defendant
MARK & PAMELA OKADA FAMILY TRUST EXEMPT TRUST #1 AND LAWRENCE TONOMURA AS TRUSTEE OF MARK & PAMELA OKADA FAMILY TRUST EXEMPT TRUST #1
Represented By
MARK & PAMELA OKADA FAMILY TRUST EXEMPT TRUST #1 AND LAWRENCE TONOMURA AS TRUSTEE OF MARK & PAMELA OKADA FAMILY TRUST EXEMPT TRUST #1
contact info
Defendant
Hunter Mountain Investment Trust
Rochelle McCullough, LLP 325 North St. Paul St., Suite 4500
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Hunter Mountain Investment Trust
contact info
Defendant
GET GOOD TRUST AND GRANT JAMES SCOTT III, AS TRUSTEE OF GET GOOD TRUST
Represented By
GET GOOD TRUST AND GRANT JAMES SCOTT III, AS TRUSTEE OF GET GOOD TRUST
contact info
Defendant
DUGABOY INVESTMENT TRUST AND NANCY DONDERO, AS TRUSTEE OF DUGABOY INVESTMENT TRUST
Represented By
DUGABOY INVESTMENT TRUST AND NANCY DONDERO, AS TRUSTEE OF DUGABOY INVESTMENT TRUST
contact info
Defendant
Highland Capital Management Fund Advisors, L.P.
K&LGates LLP c/o Stephen G. Topetzes 1600 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006
Represented By
Highland Capital Management Fund Advisors, L.P.
contact info
Defendant
NexPoint Advisors, L.P.
K&L Gates LLP c/o Stephen G. Topetzes 1600 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006
Represented By
NexPoint Advisors, L.P.
contact info
Defendant
STRAND ADVISORS, INC
Represented By
STRAND ADVISORS, INC
contact info
Defendant
Frank Waterhouse
Represented By
Frank Waterhouse
contact info
Defendant
Grant James Scott III
Represented By
Grant James Scott III
contact info
Defendant
Isaac Leventon
Represented By
Isaac Leventon
contact info
Defendant
Scott Ellington
Represented By
Scott Ellington
contact info
Defendant
Mark Okada
Represented By
Mark Okada
contact info
Defendant
James D. Dondero
Represented By
James D. Dondero
contact info
Plaintiff
Marc Kirschner
Represented By
Paige Holden Montgomery
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Saturday, January 18, 2025
354 354 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sat 01/18 11:18 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 01/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 353 Order granting motion to withdraw as attorney (attorney Aaron M. Lawrence terminated). (related document352 ) Entered on 1/16/2025.
Thursday, January 16, 2025
353 353 order Withdraw as attorney Thu 01/16 12:16 PM
Order granting motion to withdraw as attorney (attorney Aaron M. Lawrence terminated). Related [+] Entered on 1/16/2025. (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-] 352
Monday, January 13, 2025
352 352 motion Withdraw as attorney Mon 01/13 7:20 PM
Motion to withdraw as attorney (Aaron Lawrence) filed by Plaintiff Marc Kirschner (Montgomery, Paige)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order