Maryland District Court
Judge:James K Bredar
Case #: 1:21-cv-02681
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2021
Terminated:May 23, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 16, 2022 6:49 AM EDT
Defendant
LJT & Associates, Inc.
9881 Broken Land Parkway, Suite 400
Columbia, MD 21046
Represented By
Ryan Christopher Posey
Posey Lebowitz PLLC
contact info
John Ronald Voss
Voss Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SRC, Inc.
7502 Round Pond Road
North Syracuse, NY 13212
Represented By
Jennifer M Schwartzott
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
40 40 order Judgment - Consent Tue 05/30 4:10 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 5/30/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc Stipulation Tue 05/30 11:01 AM
STIPULATION to Consent Judgment by SRC, Inc.(Sher, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
38 38 order Settlement Order Tue 05/23 2:59 PM
ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 5/23/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 05/23 2:45 PM
Settlement Conference held on 5/23/2023 before Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. (cw6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 05/22 12:56 PM
Telephone Conference re: Settlement held on 5/22/2023 before Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. (stds, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
37 37 2 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Wed 04/05 4:10 PM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for 5/23/2023 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 4/5/2023. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
36 36 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/05 3:44 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for Settlement. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 4/5/2023. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Wed 04/05 1:02 PM
Telephone Status Conference held on 4/5/2023 before Chief Judge James K. Bredar. (jks, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
order Order Wed 03/22 11:49 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER. A STATUS TELEPHONE CONFERENCE is set in for 4/5/23 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for the Plaintiff is directed to arrange for and distribute conference call information to counsel and Judge Bredar's chambers. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 3/22/2023. (vdcs, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
34 34 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 03/21 9:35 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SRC, Inc..(Sher, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
33 33 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 03/07 8:29 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LJT & Associates, Inc..(Posey, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Deposition of Sharon Harris
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
32 32 motion Summary Judgment Tue 02/21 9:58 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by SRC, Inc..(Sher, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Appendix,
Att: 4 Exhibit A - Chambers Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit B - Sher Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit C - Purchase Order,
Att: 7 Exhibit D - Subpoena to NASA,
Att: 8 Exhibit E - NASA's Certified Subpoena Response,
Att: 9 Exhibit F - Invoices
Thursday, September 22, 2022
31 31 1 pgs order Order Thu 09/22 2:53 PM
MARGINAL ORDER granting30 Status Report and Request for Final Extension of Deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 9/22/2022. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
30 30 misc Status Report Tue 09/20 4:50 PM
STATUS REPORT and Request for Final Extension of Deadlines by SRC, Inc.(Sher, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
order Order Wed 08/10 9:43 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER. The parties' joint request for a 45-day extension of the discovery, requests for admission, and dispositive motions deadlines (ECF No. 27) is GRANTED. The discovery deadline is now 9/22/22; the requests for admission deadline is now 9/29/22; and the dispositive motions deadline is now 10/24/22. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 8/10/2022. (vdcs, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
order Order Tue 08/09 1:50 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: The Settlement Conference scheduled for August 25, 2022 is Canceled at the request of the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 8/9/2022. (Chambers)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 08/09 2:30 PM
Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to case. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
27 27 misc Status Report Mon 08/08 2:19 PM
STATUS REPORT by SRC, Inc.(Sher, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/21 3:17 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeremy M Sher. Directing attorney Jeremy M Sher to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 7/21/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
25 25 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/19 2:17 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeremy M. Sher (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10057338.) by SRC, Inc.(Schwartzott, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
24 24 2 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Wed 03/09 11:38 AM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 3/9/2022. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/09 10:46 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 8/8/2022. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 3/8/2022.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum to Counsel Regarding Discovery Procedures
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 03/09 8:44 AM
Scheduled Telephone Conference held on 3/8/2022 before Chief Judge James K. Bredar.(Court Reporter: None) (mdss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
21 21 corresp Miscellaneous Tue 02/22 12:51 PM
Correspondence re: Proposed Scheduling Order(vdcs, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Set Aside Default Tue 02/22 12:13 PM
ORDER granting16 Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default and vacating the previously entered11 default. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 2/18/2022. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
19 19 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/03 2:21 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of J Ronald Voss. Directing attorney J Ronald Voss to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/3/2022. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Thu 02/03 2:19 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by LJT & Associates, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LJT Holdings, LLC for LJT & Associates, Inc..(Posey, Ryan)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/03 1:59 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. Ronald Voss (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9733924.) by LJT & Associates, Inc.(Posey, Ryan)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Set Aside Default Thu 02/03 1:56 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Default by LJT & Associates, Inc.(Posey, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/03 1:54 PM
Defendant LJT & Associates, Inc.'s ANSWER to1 Complaint by LJT & Associates, Inc..(Posey, Ryan)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/03 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Christopher Posey on behalf of LJT & Associates, Inc. (Posey, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
13 13 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/07 2:58 PM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to file and serve by mail a motion for default judgment or provide a report as to why such motion would be inappropriate. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/7/2022. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 06, 2021
12 12 notice Notice of Default Mon 12/06 3:24 PM
NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to LJT & Associates, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 12/06 3:23 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to LJT & Associates, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 02, 2021
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Thu 12/02 3:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Entry of Default served on LJT & Associates on 12/02/2021, filed by SRC, Inc..(Schwartzott, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Default - Clerk's Entry of Thu 12/02 2:42 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by SRC, Inc.(Schwartzott, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Jennifer M. Schwartzott, Esq.,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support
Friday, November 19, 2021
8 8 1 pgs order Order Fri 11/19 11:36 AM
ORDER directing Plaintiff file and serve a motion for the Clerk's entry of default as to Defendant LJT & Associates, Inc. or provide a report to the Court why such motion is inappropriate. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 11/18/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/02 2:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SRC, Inc.. LJT & Associates, Inc. served on 10/27/2021, answer due 11/17/2021.(Schwartzott, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 11/02 2:24 PM
QC NOTICE:5 Affidavit of Service filed by SRC, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event was selected. Please refile using the event under Service of Process > Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Mon 11/01 2:48 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on LJT & Associates, Inc. on 10/27/2021, filed by SRC, Inc..(Schwartzott, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
4 4 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Tue 10/26 11:42 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by SRC, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate SRC International, Inc., Other Affiliate SRC Ventures, Inc., Other Affiliate SRC AUS Pty Ltd, Other Affiliate SRC CAN Ltd, Other Affiliate SRC UK Ltd, Other Affiliate SRCTec, LLC, Other Affiliate SAZE, LLC for SRC, Inc..(Schwartzott, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 10/19 9:20 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to LJT & Associates, Inc. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 10/19 9:19 AM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint filed by SRC, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Each exhibit to the Complaint should be filed as separate and individual attachment to the Complaint. Your document has been accepted as filed. No corrective action is required in regard to this filing. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice Deficiency Notice Tue 10/19 9:19 AM
Deficiency Notice to SRC, Inc. Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 10/26/2021 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
1 1 38 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 10/18 4:47 PM
COMPLAINT against LJT & Associates, Inc. against SRC, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9555556.), filed by SRC, Inc..(Schwartzott, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet