Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:David S Cercone
Case #: 2:21-cv-01391
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2021
Terminated:Dec 04, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 13, 2022 5:20 AM EDT
Defendant
DILLI ADHIKARI
Represented By
Andrew J. Horowitz
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel, LLP
contact info
Bruce C. Fox
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
contact info
George Charles Thompson
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
contact info
Defendant
INTRA-NATIONAL HOME CARE, LLC
Represented By
Andrew J. Horowitz
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel, LLP
contact info
Bruce C. Fox
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
contact info
George Charles Thompson
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
contact info
Mediator
LOUIS B. KUSHNER
310 Grant Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15219
Represented By
Louis B. Kushner
Rothman Gordon, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
SECRETARY OF LABOR MARTIN J. WALSH
Represented By
Ethan Dennis
U.S. Department Of Labor
contact info
Andrea Christensen Luby
U.S. Department Of Labor
contact info

GPO Sep 01 2023
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 47 the Secretary's motion to dismiss defendants' counterclaim. The counterclaim set forth in 36 defendants' Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim is dismissed. All as more fully set forth in the Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 9/1/23. (mwm)
GPO Sep 01 2023
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 71 defendants' motion for leave to file First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim. The motion is granted to the extent it seeks to modify the Tenth Affirmative Defense and add the Eleventh and Twelfth Affirmative Defenses. The motion is denied in all other aspects. All as more fully set forth in the memorandum Order. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 9/1/23. (mwm)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
178 178 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 9:05 AM
ORDER granting176 Motion for James Wen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 4/22/2025. (lyk) Modified text on 4/22/2025. (cel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
177 177 misc Proposed Order Fri 04/18 11:52 AM
Proposed Order re176 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (corrected) by JULIE A SU, JULIE A SU, Julie Su. (Wen, James)
Related: [-]
176 176 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Fri 04/18 11:38 AM
MOTION for attorney James Wen to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70 by JULIE A SU, JULIE A SU, Julie Su. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Wen, James) Proposed Order removed from public view; corrected Proposed Order filed at177 . Modified text on 4/18/2025. (keh)
Related: [-]
175 175 notice Notice of Subst of Atty (Use to subst attys w/in the same firm) Fri 04/18 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance by James Wen on behalf of JULIE A SU, JULIE A SU, Julie Su. Attorney Cynthia Liao terminated. (Wen, James)
Related: [-]