Sagome v. Cincinnati Insurance Company
Original Case: 1:21-cv-00097
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01359 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Oct 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 03, 2023 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 05, 2023 1:31 AM MST |
Amicus Curiae
UNITED POLICYHOLDERS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
AMERICAN PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SAGOME, INC., DBA L'Hostaria
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jan 03 2023
[10966412] Affirmed;Terminated on the merits after oral hearing; Written, signed, published; Judges Hartz, Tymkovich (authoring) and Matheson. Mandate to issue. [21-1359] |
Docket last updated: 01/05/2023 1:31 AM MST |
Friday, October 15, 2021 | ||
[10865392] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/15/2021 Docketing statement, transcript order form and entry of appearance due 10/29/2021 for Sagome, Inc.. Notice of appearance due on 10/29/2021 for Cincinnati Insurance Company. 21-1359 | ||
Att: 1 18 pgs Preliminary ROA | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |