Original Case: 1:21-cv-01281

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv.pr-02170
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2021
Terminated:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Dec 12, 2024 6:18 AM EST
Amicus Supporting Appellee
THE HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES
Represented By
Ralph E. Henry
HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES
contact info
Jessica Meltzer
HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BRIAN E. FROSH
Represented By
Ryan Robert Dietrich
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF MARYLAND
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
THE HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES
Represented By
Ralph E. Henry
HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ANTHONY G. BROWN
Represented By
Ryan Robert Dietrich
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF MARYLAND
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JUST PUPPIES, INC., d/b/a Just Puppies Towson
Represented By
Meagan Cooper Borgerson
KAGAN STERN MARINELLO & BEARD, LLC
contact info
Jonathan Paul Kagan
KAGAN STERN MARINELLO & BEARD, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JUST PUPPIES OF MARYLAND INC., d/b/a Just Puppies Rockville
Represented By
Meagan Cooper Borgerson
KAGAN STERN MARINELLO & BEARD, LLC
contact info
Jonathan Paul Kagan
KAGAN STERN MARINELLO & BEARD, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHARM CITY PUPPIES, LLC, d/b/a Charm City Puppies & Boutique
Represented By
Meagan Cooper Borgerson
KAGAN STERN MARINELLO & BEARD, LLC
contact info
Jonathan Paul Kagan
KAGAN STERN MARINELLO & BEARD, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SOBRAD, LLC, d/b/a Pinnacle Pet
Represented By
Meagan Cooper Borgerson
KAGAN STERN MARINELLO & BEARD, LLC
contact info
Jonathan Paul Kagan
KAGAN STERN MARINELLO & BEARD, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
TARA BAKER, d/b/a Valley View Kennel
Represented By
Meagan Cooper Borgerson
KAGAN STERN MARINELLO & BEARD, LLC
contact info
Jonathan Paul Kagan
KAGAN STERN MARINELLO & BEARD, LLC
contact info

GPO Dec 11 2024
PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-01281-ELH. [1001684964] [21-2170]

Docket last updated: 12/12/2024 6:16 AM EST
Monday, October 18, 2021
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-01281-ELH. Case manager: AWalker. 21-2170 AW [Entered: 10/18/2021 03:59 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 6 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-01281-ELH. 21-2170 AW [Entered: 10/18/2021 04:01 PM]
Related: [-]