California Northern District Court
Judge:Beth Labson Freeman
Case #: 5:21-cv-08141
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Oct 19, 2021
Terminated:Mar 16, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Apr 17, 2022 2:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Barron Ranches, Inc.
Represented By
Giuliana Rose Ferrante
Hayes Scott Bonino Ellingson Guslani Simonson Clause LLP
contact info
Daniel W. Ballesteros
Hoge, Fenton, Jones & Appel Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Homestead Bowl
Represented By
Giuliana Rose Ferrante
Hayes Scott Bonino Ellingson Guslani Simonson Clause LLP
contact info
Daniel W. Ballesteros
Hoge, Fenton, Jones & Appel Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Johnson
Represented By
Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Centery For Disability Access
contact info
Dennis Jay Price, II
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Prathima Reddy Price
Center For Disability Access
contact info


Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Friday, May 06, 2022
17 17 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 05/06 1:28 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Scott Johnson.(Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
16 16 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/16 9:54 AM
ORDER GRANTING 15 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO VACATE ALL DATES; DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE DISMISSAL OR STATUS REPORT BY MAY 16, 2022; AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/16/22. (blflc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/15 12:34 PM
NOTICE by Scott Johnson OF SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST TO VACATE ALL CURRENTLY SET DATES(Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/04 3:18 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Barron Ranches, Inc., Homestead Bowl. (Ballesteros, Daniel) Modified on 1/4/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
13 13 2 pgs order Order Tue 12/21 7:43 AM
ORDER GRANTING 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/21/2021. (blflc4, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
12 12 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 12/20 5:50 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT filed by Barron Ranches, Inc., Homestead Bowl. (Ballesteros, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/29 4:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Homestead Bowl served on 11/28/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/29 2:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Barron Ranches, Inc. served on 11/28/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 11/05 8:57 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 11/5/2021.(bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Thursday, October 21, 2021
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 10/21 8:00 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 10/21 12:50 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case Wed 10/20 10:26 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (cjlS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 10/20 10:25 AM
Summons Issued as to Barron Ranches, Inc., Homestead Bowl. (cjlS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 10/19 8:37 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/2/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Tue 10/19 7:27 AM
Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 10/19 7:27 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/19 7:25 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16510907.). Filed byScott Johnson.(Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet