Original Case: 1:19-cv-03039

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-02911
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Oct 19, 2021
Terminated:Jan 26, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Jan 27, 2022 2:32 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.
Represented By
Maria A. Boelen
BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JUSTIN DIAMOND
Represented By
Jamie S. Franklin
CHICAGO KENT COLLEGE OF LAW
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/27/2022 2:29 AM CST
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet filed. Appellant's brief due on or before 11/29/2021 for Justin Diamond. [1] [7193001] 21-2911 (PS) [Entered: 10/19/2021 03:44 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 28 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court