Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:21-cv-00800
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Oct 19, 2021
Terminated:Nov 22, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Apr 17, 2022 5:03 AM CDT
Defendant
Idemia Identity and Security USA LLC
Represented By
Jeremy D. Sosna
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (minneapolis)
contact info
J. Christopher Anderson
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nashville)
contact info
Elise Hofer McKelvey
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nashville)
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Carroll
Represented By
Heather M. Collins
Hmc Civil Rights Law, PLLC
contact info
Leigh Anne St. Charles
Sanford Heisler Sharp, LLP
contact info
Kevin H. Sharp
Sanford Heisler Sharp, LLP
contact info
Caroline Drinnon
Collins & Hunter PLLC
contact info

GPO Nov 22 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/22/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
104 104 order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Thu 05/08 4:26 PM
ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Renew Defendants Bill of Costs102 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is hereby requested to rule upon the pending Bill of Costs. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/8/2025. (kc) Modified on 5/8/2025 (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
103 103 misc Declaration Wed 05/07 4:53 PM
DECLARATION of Claire Welch filed by Idemia Identity and Security USA LLC re:102 MOTION for Reconsideration to Renew Defendant's Bill of Costs .(Welch, Claire)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Unpublished Opinion
102 102 motion Reconsideration Wed 05/07 4:49 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration to Renew Defendant's Bill of Costs by Idemia Identity and Security USA LLC. (Welch, Claire)
Related: [-]