Minnesota District Court
Judge:Katherine M Menendez
Referred: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Case #: 0:21-cv-02333
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2021
Terminated:Jul 25, 2022
Last checked: Monday Apr 18, 2022 5:56 AM CDT
Defendant
McQuillan Bros Plumbing Heating & AC, L.L.C.
Represented By
Martin D Kappenman
Peters, Revnew, Kappenman & Anderson, P.A.
contact info
Thomas R Revnew
Peters, Revnew, Kappenman & Anderson, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Pipe Trade Services MN, Inc.
Represented By
Stacey L Drentlaw
Taft Stettinius & Hollister, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, July 25, 2022
29 29 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 07/25 12:47 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/25/2022. (KAT)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Mon 07/25 9:37 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re27 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Drentlaw, Stacey)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 07/25 9:35 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Pipe Trade Services MN, Inc.. Jointly Signed by McQuillan Bros Plumbing Heating & AC, L.L.C.. (Drentlaw, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
26 26 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Fri 03/25 11:16 AM
ORDER/NOTICE: Confidential Letter to Court due by 7/26/2022. Settlement Conference set for 8/2/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/25/2022.(TMA)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Fri 03/25 9:41 AM
ORDER/NOTICE: Amended Pleadings due by 4/11/2022. Fact Discovery due by 1/6/2023. Expert Discovery due by 2/10/2023. Motions (non-disp) due 1/20/2023. Motions (disp) due by 4/10/2023. Ready for trial due by 8/2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/25/2022.(TMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
24 24 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Fri 03/25 9:00 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/24/2022. (TMA)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Protective Order Thu 03/24 3:30 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/24/2022.(TMA)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Thu 03/24 2:58 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re21 Stipulation. (Drentlaw, Stacey)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Stipulation Thu 03/24 2:57 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order by Pipe Trade Services MN, Inc.. Jointly Signed by McQuillan Bros Plumbing Heating & AC, L.L.C.. (Drentlaw, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 17, 2022
20 20 misc Rule 26(f) Report Thu 03/17 9:36 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Pipe Trade Services MN, Inc.. Jointly Signed by McQuillan Bros Plumbing Heating & AC, L.L.C..(Drentlaw, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
19 19 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Mon 02/07 3:53 PM
ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/17/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2022 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/7/2022.(TMA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
18 18 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Wed 02/02 4:53 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant McQuillan Bros Plumbing Heating & AC, L.L.C.. (Kappenman, Martin)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/02 4:52 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by McQuillan Bros Plumbing Heating & AC, L.L.C.. (Kappenman, Martin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
16 16 notice Notice to Attorney - KMM Elevation Case Reassigned Wed 12/29 2:13 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the elevation of Judge Katherine M. Menendez, this case is reassigned to her. Judge Nancy E. Brasel is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-02333-KMM-ECW . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (KLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 12/28 10:56 AM
ORDER on13 Stipulation. McQuillan Bros Plumbing Heating & AC, L.L.C. response due 2/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 12/28/2021.(TMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 23, 2021
14 14 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Thu 12/23 1:49 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re13 Stipulation. (Kappenman, Martin)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Stipulation Thu 12/23 1:48 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by McQuillan Bros Plumbing Heating & AC, L.L.C.. Jointly Signed by Pipe Trades Services MN, Inc.. (Kappenman, Martin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 02, 2021
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 12/02 4:05 PM
ORDER on10 Stipulation. McQuillan Bros Plumbing Heating & AC, L.L.C. response due 1/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 12/2/2021.(TMA)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Thu 12/02 9:19 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re10 Stipulation. (Kappenman, Martin)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Stipulation Thu 12/02 9:18 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by McQuillan Bros Plumbing Heating & AC, L.L.C.. Jointly Signed by Pipe Trades Services MN, Inc.. (Kappenman, Martin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 11/08 12:07 PM
ORDER on7 Stipulation,. McQuillan Bros Plumbing Heating & AC, L.L.C. response due 12/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/8/2021.(TMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 04, 2021
8 8 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Thu 11/04 2:02 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re7 Stipulation,. (Kappenman, Martin)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Stipulation Thu 11/04 2:01 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by McQuillan Bros Plumbing Heating & AC, L.L.C.. Jointly Signed by Pipe Trades Services MN, Inc. and McQuillan Bros Plumbing Heating & AC, L.L.C.. (Kappenman, Martin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/29 9:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Martin D Kappenman on behalf of McQuillan Bros Plumbing Heating & AC, L.L.C.. (Kappenman, Martin)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/29 9:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R Revnew on behalf of All Defendants. Related [+]
Related: [-] vnew, Thomas
Friday, October 22, 2021
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/22 12:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pipe Trade Services MN, Inc.. McQuillan Bros Plumbing Heating & AC, L.L.C. served on 10/20/2021, answer due 11/10/2021. (Drentlaw, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 10/20 11:57 AM
Summons Issued as to McQuillan Bros Plumbing Heating & AC, L.L.C. (CLK)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Wed 10/20 11:56 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-2333 NEB/ECW. (CLK)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/20 11:04 AM
COMPLAINT against McQuillan Bros Plumbing Heating & AC, L.L.C. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9093516) filed by Pipe Trades Services MN, Inc. Filer requests summons issued. (Drentlaw, Stacey) Modified text on 10/20/2021 (CLK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet