New York Western District Court
Judge:Lawrence J Vilardo
Case #: 1:21-cv-01138
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2021
Terminated:Apr 13, 2022
Last checked: Monday Apr 18, 2022 6:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Division of Family & Children Services of Hall County Georgia
Defendant
Ashlee Ann Gralewski
Defendant
Hall County Georgia Police Department
Defendant
Melissa S. Loftland
Defendant
State of Delaware
Defendant
State of Georgia
Defendant
Hall County Georgia District Attorneys Office
Defendant
Judge Paula T. Ryan
Defendant
Cynthia A. Susi
Plaintiff
Kyia C. Wilson
P.O. Box 256
Cuba, NY 14727


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
7 7 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 04/13 1:55 PM
ORDER: For the reasons stated in the order, Wilson's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, Docket Item2 , is granted, but this Court finds that venue over Wilson's action is not proper in the Western District of New York. In the interest of justice, this Court transfers this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a). This Court does not screen the complaint, nor does it consider the merits of Wilson's remaining motions, Docket Items3 ,4 , and5 . The Clerk of the Court shall seal Docket Items1 ,1 -1, and5 . SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 4/13/2022. (EK) (Chambers has mailed a copy of the order to the pro se plaintiff.)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out -- District Transfer Wed 04/13 2:19 PM
Case transferred to Northern District of Georgia. (CGJ)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Wed 04/13 3:19 PM
Case opened in the Northern District of Georgia under case number 2:22-cv-00075, filed on 04/13/2022. (CGJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
6 6 misc Continuation of Exhibits Wed 01/05 12:47 PM
CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to1 Complaint, filed by Kyia C. Wilson. (CGJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
5 5 motion Vacate Miscellaneous Relief Wed 12/08 12:24 PM
MOTION to Vacate, MOTION for temporary custody, MOTION for forensic audit by Kyia C. Wilson. (CGJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
4 4 motion Expedite Fri 10/29 12:18 PM
MOTION for an Expedited Hearing by Kyia C. Wilson. (CGJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 10/20 4:00 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kyia C. Wilson. (CGJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 10/20 3:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kyia C. Wilson. (CGJ)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/20 3:58 PM
COMPLAINT against Division of Family & Children Services of Hall County Georgia, Ashlee Ann Gralewski, Hall County Georgia Police Department, Melissa S. Loftland, State of Delaware, State of Georgia, filed by Kyia C. Wilson. (Original document maintained in case file due to poor scan legibility) (CGJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Wed 10/20 4:00 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] .(CGJ)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Wed 10/20 4:01 PM
Remark: Plaintiff has been given a pro se packet including a privacy notice, consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, Pro Se Assistance Program Information and ADR Notification. (CGJ)
Related: [-]