Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:21-cr-01732
Case Filed:Oct 19, 2021
Last checked: Friday Oct 22, 2021 2:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Averina Daena-Criss (1)
Represented By
Juan Ramon Flores
Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Phoenix Webb (2)
Represented By
Eustorgio Perez
Attorney At Law
contact info
Material Witness
Victor Cabello-Lopez
Represented By
Jose Luis Ramos
Ramos Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael Patrick Makens
Us Attorney'S Office - Laredo Division
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/22/2021 3:07 AM CDT
Saturday, October 02, 2021
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Averina Danea Criss (1), Phoenix Webb (2), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 10/4/2021 at 01:33 PM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos (DanyaGarzaadi, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Averina Danea Criss, Phoenix Webb, filed.(DanyaGarzaadi, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proposed Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Victor Cabello-Lopez as to Averina Danea Criss, Phoenix Webb. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 10/4/2021 at 01:33 PM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos, filed.(DanyaGarzaadi, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
4 4 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on October 2, 0021 at 04:16 PM as to Averina Danea Criss, Phoenix Webb. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (DanyaGarzaadi, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 03, 2021
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Eustorgio Perez appearing for Phoenix Webb , filed.(Perez, Eustorgio) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, October 04, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to Phoenix Webb held on 10/4/2021. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Financial Affidavit executed. Bond set at $75 000.00 c/s. Court issued oral order regarding prosecutorial obligations under Rule 5(f). Defendant sworn in. Appearances: Adam Esquire Harper, AUSA; FPD Raul Guerra (on duty); USPTO: Priscilla Ortiz; USM: Deputy Murray. (Opened/Adjourned: 1:41 PM - 2:03 PM) (ERO: David Morales) (Interpreter: Juanita Zambrana, not used) Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 10/8/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS Victor Cabello-Lopez as to Averina Danea Criss, Phoenix Webb (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 10/4/2021. Material Witness advised that no charges are pending and that Material Witness is temporarily detained in case pending Detention Hearing set for 10/8/2021 at 3:01 PM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. Financial Affidavit executed. Material Witness requests appointed counsel. Private Attorney appointed. Next on list: Jose Ramos. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. Material Witness requested a letter to be sent to consulate of Mexico. Material Witness sworn in. Appearances: Adam Esquire Harper, AUSA; Jose Ramos f/Material Witness. (Tape #2:44 PM - 2:48 PM) (ERO: David Morales ) (DUSM: Deputy Murray) (Interpreter: Juanita Zambrana/used) (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Averina Danea Criss. Attorney Juan Ramon Flores for Averina Danea Criss added. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to Averina Danea Criss held on 10/4/2021. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Bond set at $75 000.00 c/s. Court issued oral order regarding prosecutorial obligations under Rule 5(f). Defendant sworn in. Appearances: Adam Esquire Harper, AUSA; FPD Raul Guerra (on duty); USPTO: Priscilla Ortiz; USM: Deputy Murray. (Opened/Adjourned: 1:41 PM - 2:03 PM) (ERO: David Morales) (Interpreter: Juanita Zambrana, not used) Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 10/8/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
6 6 COMPLAINT accepted by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos as to Averina Danea Criss, Phoenix Webb, filed. Agent: Javier Medrano (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER on Material Witness Affidavit. The material witness(es) are committed to the custody of the U.S. Marshal's Service pending a detention hearing. Agent: Javier Medrano (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
8 8 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Averina Danea Criss, filed. (mlramirez, 5). [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Averina Danea Criss. Juan Flores appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
10 10 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Averina Danea Criss. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Averina Danea Criss. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 10/8/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
12 12 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Phoenix Webb, filed. (mlramirez, 5). [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
13 13 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Phoenix Webb. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Phoenix Webb. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 10/8/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
15 15 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Material Witness Victor Cabello-Lopez as to Averina Danea Criss, Phoenix Webb, filed. (mlramirez, 5). [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Victor Cabello-Lopez. Jose Ramos appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
17 17 Letter sent to Consulate General of Mexico re Victor Cabello-Lopez, Material Witness in case as to Averina Danea Criss, Phoenix Webb, filed. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER COMMITTING MATERIAL WITNESS Victor Cabello-Lopez to the custody of the United States Marshal. Detention Hearing set for 10/8/2021 at 03:01 PM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (CindyMiranda, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
19 19 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Averina Danea Criss, Phoenix Webb, filed.(Flores, Juan) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
20 20 NOTICE of Setting as to Phoenix Webb. Parties notified. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 10/8/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos., filed. (CindyMirandaadi, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
21 21 *Disregard Attorney filed waiver on wrong event*WAIVER of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings by Phoenix Webb, filed.(Perez, Eustorgio) Modified on 10/7/2021 (mxperez, 5). [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
22 22 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Phoenix Webb, filed.(mxperez, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos: DETENTION HEARING for Material Witness Victor Cabello-Lopez as to Averina Danea Criss, Phoenix Webb held on 10/8/2021. Material Witness not medically cleared to be presented before the Court. Hearing reset for 10/21/2021 at 3:01 pm Appearances:AUSA Brandon Bowling f/Government, Jose Luis Ramos f/Material Witness, Monica De La Fuente f/Probation.(Tape #2:28-2:29)(ERO:Emmanuel Garcia) (Interpreter:Enith Valdes), filed.(CindyMirandaadi2, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
Laredo-Notice of resetting as tp Material witness Victor Cabello-Lopez as to Averina Danea Criss, Phoenix Webb. Detention Hearing set for 10/21/2021 at 03:01 PM in by video before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga, filed.(CindyMirandaadi2, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
23 23 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Averina Danea Criss. NOTICE: Document available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter CM/ECF Filer login and password first for authentication. Be sure to SAVE the document locally at the time of viewing , filed. (hcortez, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
***Set Hearings as to Averina Danea Criss: Detention Hearing set for 10/19/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga (mxperez, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga: DETENTION HEARING as to Averina Danea Criss held on 10/19/2021. Defendant consented to proceeding by video conference. All parties appeared via Zoom. Defendant sworn in, waived right to be present in court and consents to proceed via video conference. For reasons stated on the record, Government requested detention, Defense requested bond. Court took matters under advisement, order to be issued. Appearances: Brandon Scott Bowling, AUSA; Juan Flores f/Defendant; USPO: Ana Cordova Rodriguez; USM: Deputy Gonzalez. (In Court Time: 4:45-5:08) (ERO: Vero Madrigal) (Interpreter: Juanita Zambrana/not used) Deft remanded to custody. (FernandoVillaadi, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
24 24 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Phoenix Webb. NOTICE: Document available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter CM/ECF Filer login and password first for authentication. Be sure to SAVE the document locally at the time of viewing , filed. (FernandoJRodriguez, 5) [5:21-mj-02199]
Related: [-]
25 25 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Averina Danea Criss (1) count(s) 1, 2, Phoenix Webb (2) count(s) 1, filed. (MargaretPeregoy, 5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment