Utah District Court
Case #: 2:21-cr-00442
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2021
Terminated:Oct 20, 2021
Last checked: Friday Oct 22, 2021 1:19 AM MDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ruth J. Hackford-Peer
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Travis Kozlowski (1)
Terminated: 10/20/2021


Docket last updated: 10/22/2021 2:18 AM MDT
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
1 1 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION for Supervised Release as to Travis Kozlowski from USDC District of South Carolina. Assigned to Judge David Barlow.(jl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum
2 2 TRANSFER OF SUPERVISED RELEASE JURISDICTION FILE as to Travis Kozlowski. Received certified copies of indictment, judgment and docket sheet from USDC District of South Carolina.. (jl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Indictment,
Att: 2 Judgment
3 3 Notice to USDC District of South Carolina of a Transfer of Jurisdiction as to Travis Kozlowski. Your case number is: 2:19-cr-00347-RMG-3. Our case number is 2:21cr00442-DBB assigned to David Barlow. Order Accepting Transfer of Jurisdiction attached signed by Judge Shelby. (If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov. If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) (jl)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Ruth J. Hackford-Peer appearing for USA. (Hackford-Peer, Ruth)
Related: [-]