Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-01710
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2021
Terminated:Jul 28, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 20, 2022 5:06 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
KARIS RICHMOND
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER A SEEGER
Seeger Weiss LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, July 28, 2022
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 08/02 2:24 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a Court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/28/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/22 2:56 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6507660.), filed by KARIS RICHMOND. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet