Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-01713
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2021
Terminated:Feb 17, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 20, 2022 4:47 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
RODNEY SANDFORD
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER A SEEGER
Seeger Weiss LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, February 17, 2023
3 3 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 02/17 10:21 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by RODNEY SANDFORD. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
2 2 2 pgs order Order Thu 02/02 9:48 AM
ORDER - Despite the Court's warnings, the 609 plaintiffs identified in Exhibits A and B have more than one case filed on the active docket. The law firms representing these plaintiffs are directed to confer with one another and move to dismiss the case that is deemed to be the duplicate case within 21 days of the date of this Order. To the extent the law firms fail to dismiss the duplicate case by the deadline, the Court will dismiss the later filed case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/1/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, October 22, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/22 3:11 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6507684.), filed by RODNEY SANDFORD. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet