Democratic Party of Virginia v. Veal et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | M Hannah Lauck |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-00671 |
Nature of Suit | 441 Civil Rights - Voting |
Cause | 42:1983 Violation of Due Process and Equal Protection |
Case Filed: | Oct 22, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 16, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 20, 2022 4:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
Gerald Roane
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Frank Veal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Democratic Party of Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, November 16, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
order
So Ordered Order Dismissing Case
Tue 11/16 11:49 AM
SO ORDERED STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. In accordance with the Court's October 28 Order (ECF No.27 ), Plaintiff Democratic Party of Virginia and Defendants Frank Veal and Gerald Roane, in their official capacities, stipulate that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Each party agrees to bear the party's own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 11/16/2021. (sbea) |
|
Wednesday, November 10, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 11/10 10:39 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Gerald Roane, Frank Veal. (Lucier, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, October 29, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Transcript
Fri 10/29 2:58 PM
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on October 27, 2021, before Judge M. Hannah Lauck, Court Reporter Diane Daffron, Telephone number 804 916-2893. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/29/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2022.(daffron, diane) |
|
Thursday, October 28, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
order
So Ordered
Thu 10/28 6:52 PM
So Ordered re26 Stipulation filed by Gerald Roane, Frank Veal. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/28/21. (khan, ) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation
Thu 10/28 5:33 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order by Gerald Roane, Frank Veal. (Lucier, Jonathan) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/28 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Evan Borson on behalf of Gerald Roane, Frank Veal (Borson, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, October 27, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 10/27 5:20 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck:Status Conference held on 10/27/2021 regarding Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. Parties reached an agreement regarding the TRO and have asked the Court to hold the matter in abeyance until tomorrow, 10/28/21 at 5:00 p.m. to file an Order with the Court. The Court will hold the matter in abeyance until 10/28/21 at 5:00 p.m. (Court Reporter Diane Daffron, OCR.)(khan, ) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Wed 10/27 2:10 PM
RESPONSE in Support re8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Democratic Party of Virginia.(Breit, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Henry J. Brewster, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Brewster Decl. Ex. A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Brewster Decl. Ex. B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Brewster Decl. Ex. C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Brewster Decl. Ex. D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Brewster Decl. Ex. E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Brewster Decl. Ex. F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Brewster Decl. Ex. G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Brewster Decl. Ex. H | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Wed 10/27 10:19 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion for John Jerry Robinson to appear as Pro Hac Vice for Frank Veal and Gerald Roane. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/27/2021. (sbea) |
|
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Wed 10/27 9:47 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for David Robert Fox to appear as Pro Hac Vice for the Democratic Party of Virginia. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/27/2021. (sbea) |
|
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 10/27 8:40 AM
ORDER that: 1) Defendant Veal is granted leave and is not required to attend the October 27, 2021 hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; and, 2) Defendant Gerald Roane and U.S. Postal Service employees Benjamin Farmer III and Dr. Wendy M. McLlwain shall attend on behalf of Defendants. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/27/2021. (sbea) |
|
Tuesday, October 26, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 10/26 6:41 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John J. Robinson and Certification of Local Counsel Jonathan T. Lucier by Gerald Roane, Frank Veal. (Lucier, Jonathan) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Tue 10/26 5:54 PM
Consent MOTION Leave as to U.S. Postal Service Attendees at October 27 Hearing re12 Order,,,, by Gerald Roane, Frank Veal.(Lucier, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17
21
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition
Tue 10/26 4:28 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Gerald Roane, Frank Veal.(Lucier, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Farmer Declaration), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (McIlwain Declaration) | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Tue 10/26 3:52 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Henry Brewster to appear as Pro Hac Vice for the Democratic Party of Virginia. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/26/2021. (sbea) |
|
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Tue 10/26 3:44 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Elisabeth Carmel Frost to appear as Pro Hac Vice for the Democratic Party of Virginia. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/26/2021. (sbea) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 10/26 3:10 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David Robert Fox and Certification of Local Counsel Jeffrey Breit Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8069251. by Democratic Party of Virginia. (Breit, Jeffrey) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 10/26 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Tyler Lucier on behalf of Gerald Roane, Frank Veal (Lucier, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, October 25, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/25 7:01 PM
ORDER - This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. On October 22, 2021, Plaintiff Democratic Party of Virginia ("DPVA") filed a Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (the "Complaint"). On October 25, 2021, the Court conducted a conference call with Plaintiff and Defense Counsel. Shortly thereafter, Plaintiff filed an Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof (the "Motion").8 As stated during the conference call, the Court ORDERS Defendants to file their response to the Motion no later than 4:00 p.m. tomorrow, October 26. 2021. The Court further ORDERS the parties, including Defendants Frank Veal and Gerald Roane, to appear in person for a hearing on the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order on October 27. 2021. at 3:30 p.m. at the Spottswood W. Robinson III and Robert R. Merhige, Jr., Federal Courthouse in Richmond, Virginia. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/25/2021. (tjoh, ) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 10/25 5:42 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Henry Brewster and Certification of Local Counsel Jeffrey Breit Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8067291. by Democratic Party of Virginia. (Breit, Jeffrey) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 10/25 5:41 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Elisabeth Frost and Certification of Local Counsel Jeffrey Breit Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8067282. by Democratic Party of Virginia. (Breit, Jeffrey) |
|
9 | 9
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 10/25 5:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck (Diane Daffron, OCR): Telephone Conference call held on October 25, 2021 regarding filing of complaint; Plaintiff updated Court on status of complaint; Defendants have not been served; however, they have a copy of the complaint; Plaintiff directed to file a TRO and Motion for Preliminary Injunction today (10/25/21); Defendant directed to respond by 4:00 p.m. on October 26, 2021; Status hearing to be held in-person on October 27, 2021 at 3:30 p.m.; Court directed named defendants to be present, in court, for status hearing. (mful) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Mon 10/25 5:20 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Democratic Party of Virginia.(Breit, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of David R. Fox, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Fox Decl. Ex. A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Fox Decl. Ex. B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Fox Decl. Ex. C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Fox Decl. Ex. D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Fox Decl. Ex. E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Fox Decl. Ex. F, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 10/25 1:37 PM
Summons Issued as to the Attorney General of the United States and the United States Attorney. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA, do not enter a service date. (sbea) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 10/25 12:52 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint to the U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of VA by Democratic Party of Virginia. (Breit, Jeffrey) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 10/25 12:51 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint to Attorney General of the United States by Democratic Party of Virginia. (Breit, Jeffrey) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 10/25 8:30 AM
Summons Issued as to Gerald Roane, Frank Veal, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (tjoh, ) |
|
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 10/25 8:20 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (tjoh, ) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 10/25 5:28 PM
Status Conference set for 10/27/2021 at 3:30 PM in Richmond Courtroom 6100 before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (mful) |
||
Friday, October 22, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 10/22 7:51 PM
Proposed Summons to Gerald Roane in his official capacity by Democratic Party of Virginia. (Breit, Jeffrey) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 10/22 7:51 PM
Proposed Summons to Frank Veal in his official capacity by Democratic Party of Virginia. (Breit, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/22 6:05 PM
Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8064597.), filed by Democratic Party of Virginia.(Breit, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |