California Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00257
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2021
Terminated:May 13, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 23, 2021 12:28 AM PDT
Defendant
Ricardo Ballardo Quintero (1)
Defendant
Juan Suarez, Jr. (2)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Fresno Forfeiture Unit
United States Attorney'S Office, Fresno
contact info
Jessica A. Massey
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Oct 07 2021
ORDER SEALING CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero, Juan Suarez, Jr,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/6/2021. (Martin-Gill, S)[1:21-mj-00110-SAB]ORDER SEALING CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero, Juan Suarez, Jr,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/6/2021. (Martin-Gill, S)[1:21-mj-00110-SAB]
GPO Oct 12 2021
ORDER UNSEALING COMPLAINT and Arrest Warrant, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/12/2021 as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero, Juan Suarez, Jr. (Marrujo, C)[1:21-mj-00110-SAB]ORDER UNSEALING COMPLAINT and Arrest Warrant, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/12/2021 as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero, Juan Suarez, Jr. (Marrujo, C)[1:21-mj-00110-SAB]
GPO Oct 14 2021
DETENTION ORDER, as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/14/2021. (Valdez, E)[1:21-mj-00110-SAB]
GPO Oct 14 2021
DETENTION ORDER, as to Juan Suarez, Jr. (2), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/14/2021. (Valdez, E)[1:21-mj-00110-SAB]
GPO Nov 10 2021
STIPULATION AND ORDER BETWEEN THE UNITED STATES AND DEFENDANT FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero (1). Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/9/2021. (Kusamura, W)
GPO Nov 10 2021
STIPULATION AND ORDER BETWEEN THE UNITED STATES AND DEFENDANT FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Juan Suarez Jr. (2). Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/9/2021. (Kusamura, W)
GPO Apr 13 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero, Juan Suarez, Jr signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/13/2022. The Status Conference currently set for 4/20/2022 is CONTINUED to 9/21/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Kusamura, W)STIPULATION and ORDER as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero, Juan Suarez, Jr signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/13/2022. The Status Conference currently set for 4/20/2022 is CONTINUED to 9/21/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Kusamura, W)
GPO Apr 14 2022
AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero, Juan Suarez, Jr signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/13/2022. The Status Conference currently set for 4/20/2022 is CONTINUED to 10/5/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Kusamura, W)AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero, Juan Suarez, Jr signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/13/2022. The Status Conference currently set for 4/20/2022 is CONTINUED to 10/5/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Kusamura, W)
GPO Sep 28 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero, Juan Suarez, Jr signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/28/2022. The Status Conference currently set for 10/5/2022 is CONTINUED to 11/30/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Kusamura, W)STIPULATION and ORDER as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero, Juan Suarez, Jr signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/28/2022. The Status Conference currently set for 10/5/2022 is CONTINUED to 11/30/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Kusamura, W)
GPO Nov 23 2022
Amended Stipulation regarding excludable time periods under Speedy Trial Act; Order as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero (1) & Juan Suarez, Jr (2), signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/23/2022. (Status Conference currently set for 11/30/2022 has been CONTUNED to 4/5/2023 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto) Excludable started as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero, Juan Suarez, Jr: XT Start: 11/30/2022 Stop: 4/5/2023. (Rosales, O.)Amended Stipulation regarding excludable time periods under Speedy Trial Act; Order as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero (1) & Juan Suarez, Jr (2), signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/23/2022. (Status Conference currently set for 11/30/2022 has been CONTUNED to 4/5/2023 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto) Excludable started as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero, Juan Suarez, Jr: XT Start: 11/30/2022 Stop: 4/5/2023. (Rosales, O.)
GPO Mar 29 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero, Juan Suarez, Jr signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/29/2023. Trial Confirmation Hearing is set for 9/25/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial is set for 10/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The status conference set for 4/5/2023 before Judge Oberto is VACATED. (Kusamura, W)STIPULATION and ORDER as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero, Juan Suarez, Jr signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/29/2023. Trial Confirmation Hearing is set for 9/25/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial is set for 10/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The status conference set for 4/5/2023 before Judge Oberto is VACATED. (Kusamura, W)
GPO Sep 08 2023
STIPULATION TO VACATE TRIAL AND SET CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING; ORDER as to Juan Suarez, Jr. signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on September 8, 2023. Change of Plea Hearing set for 10/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Trial Confirmation currently set for 9/25/2023 and Jury Trial currently set for 10/24/23 is VACATED as to Juan Suarez, Jr. ONLY. (Munoz, I) Modified on 9/8/2023 (Munoz, I).
GPO Sep 15 2023
STIPULATION TO VACATE TRIAL AND SET CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING; ORDER as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on September 15, 2023. Change of Plea Hearing set for 10/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Trial Confirmation Hearing currently set for 9/25/2023 and Jury Trial currently set for 10/24/2023 is VACATED as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero. (Munoz, I)
GPO Dec 19 2023
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF SENTENCING HEARING signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on December 19, 2023. Sentencing as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero currently set for 2/20/2024 has been CONTINUED to 4/22/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Munoz, I)
GPO Feb 02 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Juan Suarez, Jr signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on February 2, 2024. Sentencing currently set for 2/20/2024 has been CONTINUED to 3/11/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Munoz, I)
GPO Mar 06 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Juan Suarez, Jr signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on March 6, 2024. Sentencing currently set for 3/11/2024 has been CONTINUED to 5/13/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Munoz, I)
GPO May 01 2024
JUDGMENT and COMMITMENT signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/1/2024 as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero. (Navarro, F)

Docket last updated: 07/23/2024 10:51 PM PDT
Thursday, October 07, 2021
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero (1), Juan Suarez, Jr (2). (Martin-Gill, S) [1:21-mj-00110-SAB]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER SEALING CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero, Juan Suarez, Jr,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/6/2021. (Martin-Gill, S) [1:21-mj-00110-SAB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
5 5 MOTION to UNSEAL Complaint, by USA as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero, Juan Suarez, Jr. (Marrujo, C) [1:21-mj-00110-SAB]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER UNSEALING COMPLAINT and Arrest Warrant, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/12/2021 as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero, Juan Suarez, Jr. (Marrujo, C) [1:21-mj-00110-SAB]
Related: [-]
7 7 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe: INITIAL APPEARANCE re Criminal Complaint as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero (1) held on 10/12/2021. Attorney Robert Forkner retained. The Court noted the hearing was conducted via video conference pursuant to General Order 614, 620, 624, 628, 630, 632 & 635 and the CARES Act. Defendant and counsel consented to the appearance by video. Defendant advised of charges, rights, and maximum penalties. Defense received Complaint; True Name stated as charged; waived reading and advisement of rights - DENIALS ENTERED. Government requested detention. Defense counsel requested matter be set for detention hearing. Detention Hearing set for 10/14/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe . Defendant ordered temporarily detained. Preliminary Examination set for 10/26/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean . Government Counsel: Jessica Massey - present via zoom. Defense Counsel: Robert Forkner - present via zoom. U.S. Pretrial Services Officer: Ryan Beckwith - present via zoom. Custody Status: in Custody - present via zoom. Court Reporter/CD Number: Rachael Lundy. (Valdez, E) [1:21-mj-00110-SAB]
Related: [-]
8 8 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe: INITIAL APPEARANCE re Criminal Complaint as to Juan Suarez, Jr. (2) held on 10/12/2021. Attorney Percy Martinez retained. The Court noted the hearing was conducted via video conference pursuant to General Order 614, 620, 624, 628, 630, 632 & 635 and the CARES Act. Defendant and counsel consented to the appearance by video. Defendant advised of charges, rights, and maximum penalties. Defense received Complaint; True Name stated as charged; waived reading and advisement of rights - DENIALS ENTERED. Government requested detention. Defense counsel requested matter be set for detention hearing. Detention Hearing set for 10/14/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe . Defendant ordered temporarily detained. Preliminary Examination set for 10/26/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean . Government Counsel: Jessica Massey - present via zoom. Defense Counsel: Percy Martinez - present via zoom. U.S. Pretrial Services Officer: Frank Guerrero - present via zoom. Custody Status: in Custody - present via zoom. Court Reporter/CD Number: Rachael Lundy. (Valdez, E) [1:21-mj-00110-SAB]
Related: [-]
9 9 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 10/8/2021 as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero. (Lundstrom, T) [1:21-mj-00110-SAB]
Related: [-]
10 10 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 10/8/2021 as to Juan Suarez, Jr. (Lundstrom, T) [1:21-mj-00110-SAB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
11 11 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe: DETENTION HEARING as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero (1) held on 10/14/2021. The Court noted the hearing was conducted via video conference pursuant to General Order 614, 620, 624, 628, 630, 632 & 635 and the CARES Act. Defendant and counsel consented to the appearance by video. The Court received and reviewed the pretrial services reports. Detention Hearing held - the government sought detention; argued & submitted. The Court ordered defendant DETAINED. Preliminary Examination set for 10/26/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean was confirmed . Government Counsel: Stephanie Stokman - present via zoom. Defense Counsel: Robert Forkner - present via zoom. U.S. Pretrial Services Officer: Ryan Beckwith - present via zoom. Custody Status: in Custody - present via zoom. Court Reporter/CD Number: Rachael Lundy. (Valdez, E) [1:21-mj-00110-SAB]
Related: [-]
12 12 DETENTION ORDER, as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/14/2021. (Valdez, E) [1:21-mj-00110-SAB]
Related: [-]
13 13 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe: DETENTION HEARING as to Juan Suarez, Jr. (2) held on 10/14/2021. The Court noted the hearing was conducted via video conference pursuant to General Order 614, 620, 624, 628, 630, 632 & 635 and the CARES Act. Defendant and counsel consented to the appearance by video. The Court received and reviewed the pretrial services reports. Detention Hearing held - the government sought detention; argued & submitted. The Court ordered defendant DETAINED. Preliminary Examination set for 10/26/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean was confirmed . Government Counsel: Stephanie Stokman - present via zoom. Defense Counsel: Percy Martinez - present via zoom. U.S. Pretrial Services Officer: Ryan Beckwith - present via zoom. Custody Status: in Custody - present via zoom. Court Reporter/CD Number: Rachael Lundy. (Valdez, E) [1:21-mj-00110-SAB]
Related: [-]
14 14 DETENTION ORDER, as to Juan Suarez, Jr. (2), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/14/2021. (Valdez, E) [1:21-mj-00110-SAB]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
15 15 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Jessica A. Massey for USA (Massey, Jessica) [1:21-mj-00110-SAB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
16 16 INDICTMENT as to Ricardo Ballardo Quintero (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Juan Suarez, Jr (2) count(s) 1, 2, 4. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 True Bill and Information Sheet
17 17 STANDING ORDER in Light of Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/21/2021. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]