New Jersey District Court
Case #: 3:21-cr-00749
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2021
Terminated:Oct 04, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 24, 2021 3:27 AM EDT
Defendant
CASSANDRA LATHAM (1)
Represented By
MICHAEL PATRICK HANLE
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
Notice Only
Randi Martorano
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
GARY ALAN WINTERS
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
REBECCA RUTH YUAN
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/17/2024 2:45 PM EST
Friday, September 24, 2021
1 1 8 pgs INFORMATION as to CASSANDRA LATHAM (1) count 1. (gxh)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by CASSANDRA LATHAM. (gxh)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Initial Appearance, Plea Agreement Hearing, and Bond Hearing as to CASSANDRA LATHAM held on 9/24/2021 via videoconference. Order regarding use of videoconferencing in accordance with Standing Order 2020-06 to be filed. Guilty Plea entered by CASSANDRA LATHAM (1) on Count 1. Sentencing set for 2/8/2022 at 1:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 5W before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Ordered bail set at $250,000.00 unsecured appearance bond with special conditions. Defendant released. (Court Reporter: CATHY FORD.) (gxh)
Related: [-]
4 4 APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to CASSANDRA LATHAM. (gxh)
Related: [-]
5 5 10 pgs PLEA AGREEMENT as to CASSANDRA LATHAM. (gxh)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: MICHAEL PATRICK HANLE appearing for CASSANDRA LATHAM. (gxh)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs BRADY ORDER as to CASSANDRA LATHAM. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/24/2021. (gxh)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER regarding use of video conferencing as to CASSANDRA LATHAM. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/24/2021. (gxh)
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to CASSANDRA LATHAM (1) $250,000.00 unsecured appearance bond with special conditions (Finance notified). Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/24/2021. (gxh)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs Unsecured Appearance Bond Entered as to CASSANDRA LATHAM in amount of $250,000.00. (gxh)
Related: [-]