Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-40029

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:James J Robinson
Case #: 1:21-ap-40020
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2021
Terminated:Feb 17, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
VANDERBILT MORTGAGE AND FINANCE, INC
PO BOX 9800
MARYVILLE, TN 37804
Represented By
VANDERBILT MORTGAGE AND FINANCE, INC
contact info
Plaintiff
Denise Gann
2530 McArthur St
Anniston, AL 36201
Represented By
Jonathan G Carpenter
Alabama Consumer Law Group, LLC
contact info
Trustee
Linda Baker Gore
NON-PAYMENTS: P.O. Box 1338
Gadsden, AL 35902


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Sunday, February 19, 2023
94 94 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 02/19 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 02/19/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 93 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Friday, February 17, 2023
93 93 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Fri 02/17 3:40 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Signed on 2/17/2023 Related [+]. (gjw)
Related: [-] 92 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Denise Gann
court Close Adversary Case Fri 02/17 3:45 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-40020 Closed (gjw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
92 92 court Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 02/16 6:34 PM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal By Denise Gann and Between Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Denise Gann. (Carpenter, Jonathan)
Related: [-]