Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-01731
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Apr 23, 2022 4:57 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
NESTOR VARGAS
Represented By
LESLEY CATHERINE PANISZCZYN
Thomas J Henry Law Pllc - Corpus Christi Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 17, 2022
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 02/17 2:03 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PANISZCZYN, LESLEY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
3 3 misc Docket Annotation Tue 01/25 2:24 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Counsel - Pursuant to N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.2, a complete and executed Civil Cover Sheet is required in each civil case filed. Please file the civil cover sheet using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings," "Other Documents." (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
2 2 misc Docket Annotation Tue 10/26 8:19 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO FILER The parties named in the referenced documents were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. For future reference: Party names are to be entered in ALL CAPS and without punctuation. Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter IV of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide" (both available on the clerk's website). (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/25 3:32 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6510021.), filed by Nestor Vargas. (PANISZCZYN, LESLEY)
Related: [-]