Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-01736
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2021
Terminated:Apr 05, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Apr 23, 2022 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
EVELYN VELEZ
Represented By
JASON BENJAMIN WOLF
Parafinczuk & Wolf - Fort Lauderdale Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
6 6 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 04/05 11:23 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by EVELYN VELEZ. (PARAFINCZUK, JUSTIN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/10 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by EVELYN VELEZ (PARAFINCZUK, JUSTIN)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Thu 03/10 3:19 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: See 3:19-md-02885-MCR-GRJ ECF No. 763 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17. re: Voluntary Dismissals. "Any Plaintiff who wishes to voluntarily dismiss any case filed in or transferred to this MDL must comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)." (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 10/25 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - KY Western by EVELYN VELEZ (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 10/25 3:52 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/25 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6510119.), filed by EVELYN VELEZ. (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]