LifeScience Technologies LLC v. Mercy Health et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah E Pitlyk |
Case #: | 4:21-cv-01279 |
Nature of Suit | 880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA) |
Cause | 18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | Oct 25, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 23, 2022 4:04 AM CDT |
Defendant
Mercy ACO Clinical Services, Inc.
14528 South Outer Forty Road Suite 100
Chesterfield, MO 63017 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mercy Health
14528 South Outer Forty Road Suite 100
Chesterfield, MO 63017 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Myia Labs, Inc.
99 Osgood Place Suite 100
San Francisco, CA 94133 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LifeScience Technologies LLC
5251 W. 116th Place Suite 200
Leawood, KS 66211 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
329 | 329
5
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 03/25 6:41 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re328 Joint MOTION for Hearing via Teleconference Regarding Plaintiff's Refusal to Produce Unredacted Expert Notes filed by Defendant Myia Labs, Inc.. (Nasser, Michelle) |
|
328 | 328
motion
Hearing
Mon 03/25 6:39 PM
Joint MOTION for Hearing via Teleconference by Defendant Myia Labs, Inc.. (Nasser, Michelle) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
327 | 327
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Fri 03/22 9:07 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Counter Claimants Mercy ACO Clinical Services, Inc., Mercy Health, Defendants Mercy ACO Clinical Services, Inc., Mercy Health, Myia Labs, Inc.. Defendants' Proposed Amended CMO . (Meyer, Jason) |
|
326 | 326
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Fri 03/22 6:58 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff LifeScience Technologies LLC. LST's Proposed Amended Case Management Order .(Warr, Jaclyn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
order
A Docket Text Order
Wed 03/20 12:07 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:315 Joint MOTION for Hearing Via Teleconference by Plaintiff LifeScience Technologies LLC. (Scheipeter, Julie) filed by LifeScience Technologies LLC; ORDERED DENIED. A Joint Scheduling PLan, which should propose dates for supplemental expert reports and extension of all dates thereafter, including Daubert and dispositive motions and trial, is due by 3/22/24. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on March 20, 2024. (HEH) |