Michigan Western District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00182
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 27, 2021 3:33 AM EDT
defendant
Marvin Maurice Cotton, Jr. (1)
Represented By
Helen C. Nieuwenhuis
Federal Public Defender (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Alcedric Lionell Kelly (2)
plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Vito S. Solitro
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info

GPO Oct 21 2021
ORDER OF DETENTION pending trial as to defendant Marvin Maurice Cotton, Jr; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)

Docket last updated: 10/27/2021 3:52 AM EDT
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
1 1 1 pgs COMPLAINT as to Marvin Maurice Cotton, Jr; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)[1:21-mj-00503-RSK *SEALED*] Modified on 10/19/2021 (jal).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Continuation of Criminal Complaint
3 3 2 pgs MOTION and ORDER TO SEAL CASE until defendant is arrested, the investigation is completed, or further order of this court; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)[1:21-mj-00503-RSK *SEALED*] Modified on 10/19/2021 (jal).
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs [DISREGARD] SEALED PENALTY SHEET re Sealed Criminal Complaint1 as to Marvin Maurice Cotton, Jr (fhw) Modified text on 9/22/2021 (sjc). [1:21-mj-00503-RSK *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
5 5 PENALTY SHEET re Criminal Complaint1 as to Marvin Maurice Cotton, Jr (fhw)[1:21-mj-00503-RSK *SEALED*] Modified on 10/19/2021 (jal).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
6 6 INDICTMENT as to Marvin Maurice Cotton, Jr, Alcedric Lionell Kelly (slk) Modified on 10/19/2021 (jal).
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs MOTION and ORDER TO SEAL CASE until defendant is arrested, the investigation is completed, or further order of this court; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (slk) Modified on 10/19/2021 (jal).
Related: [-]
10 10 3 pgs PENALTY SHEET re Sealed Indictment6 as to Marvin Maurice Cotton, Jr, Alcedric Lionell Kelly (slk) Modified on 10/19/2021 (jal).
Related: [-]