Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:James S Gwin
Case #: 1:21-cv-02017
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2021
Terminated:Jan 21, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Apr 24, 2022 5:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation
Represented By
Johanna Fabrizio Parker
Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
Jasmin Maddox
Represented By
David E. Byrnes
Spitz Law
contact info
Taurean J. Shattuck
Spitz Law
contact info
Frederick M. Bean
Spitz Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 21, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 01/21 1:19 PM
Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 1/21/22 approving the dismissal with prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction for purposes of enforcing the settlement agreement. re9 (T,A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
9 9 notice Stipulation (atty event) Thu 01/20 12:18 PM
Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation. Related document(s)1 ,8 .(Parker, Johanna)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
8 8 minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Order Mon 01/10 10:34 AM
Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 1/10/22. Upon representation of counsel and parties that the above-captioned case has been settled between the parties, IT IS ORDERED that the docket be marked, "settled and dismissed with prejudice." Parties are to file any subsequent order setting forth different terms and conditions relative to the settlement and dismissal of the within action as directed. Any such order shall supersede this order. FURTHER, the Court retains continuing jurisdiction to resolve disputes concerning the memorialization of this settlement agreement. (T,A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
7 7 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Tue 11/30 8:55 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/30/21 setting a case management conference on 1/14/2022 at 10:00 AM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Judge James S. Gwin. This Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel, and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes.(T,A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Parties' Planning Meeting Report,
Att: 2 Local Rule 30.1
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
6 6 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Tue 11/23 2:47 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation. (Parker, Johanna)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/23 2:47 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses filed by Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation.(Parker, Johanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Charge of Discrimination
Friday, November 12, 2021
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Mon 11/15 3:27 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail on executed upon Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation c/o CT Corporation System on 11/6/2021, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Jasmin Maddox Related document(s)2 . (L,Br)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Return of Service Executed Mon 11/15 3:01 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation on 11/6/2021, filed on behalf of Jasmin Maddox Related document(s)2 . (L,Br)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 04, 2021
oth_evt Service by Clerk Thu 11/04 2:22 PM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation Related [+], Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation c/o CT Corporation System placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (L,Br)
Related: [-] ceipt # 70191120000151558327ceipt # 70191120000151558334
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Tue 10/26 1:08 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation (two addresses).. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/26 10:20 AM
Complaint for damages and reinstatement with jury demand against Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11101216. Filed by Jasmin Maddox.. (Shattuck, Taurean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons X2,
Att: 3 Right to Sue
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 10/26 12:59 PM
Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 10/26 12:59 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,MI)
Related: [-]