Ohio Southern District Court
Case #: 3:21-cr-00139
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 27, 2021 3:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Artur Wojtkowski, Sr (1)
Represented By
Thomas W. Anderson
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brent Tabacchi
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/27/2021 3:37 AM EDT
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Artur Wojtkowski, Sr. (cib) [3:21-mj-00379-PBS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Artur Wojtkowski, Sr held on 10/21/2021. Brent Tabacchi appeared for USA. Defendant appeared via Video with his permission and indicated he cannot afford counsel. Art Mullins appeared on behalf of Thomas W. Anderson, appointed Sua Sponte for Artur Wojtkowski, Sr. Defendant informed of his rights, pending charges, and possible penalties. Detention Hearing set for 10/26/2021 at 11:00 AM via GoToMeeting before Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain Jr. Preliminary Hearing set for 11/4/2021 at 2:30 PM via GoToMeeting before Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington. Related [+] (cib) [3:21-mj-00379-PBS]
Related: [-] corded By: CourtSmart, record number: PBS 10-21-21
3 3 MOTION for Pretrial Detention by USA as to Artur Wojtkowski, Sr. (Tabacchi, Brent) [3:21-mj-00379-PBS]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Artur Wojtkowski, Sr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 10/21/21. (cib) [3:21-mj-00379-PBS]
Related: [-]
5 5 Order Regarding Use Of Video Teleconferencing as to Artur Wojtkowski, Sr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 10/21/21. (cib) [3:21-mj-00379-PBS]
Related: [-]
6 6 Due Process Protections Act Order as to Artur Wojtkowski, Sr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 10/21/21. (cib) [3:21-mj-00379-PBS]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Artur Wojtkowski, Sr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 10/21/21. (cib) [3:21-mj-00379-PBS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
11 11 INDICTMENT as to Artur Wojtkowski, Sr (1) count(s) 1. (pb)
Related: [-]