Original Case: 1:20-cv-01449

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-02959
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2021
Terminated:Jun 15, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Jun 16, 2022 3:30 AM CDT
Amicus Curiae
CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Geoffrey Drake
KING & SPALDING LLP
contact info
Jeffrey S. Bucholtz
KING & SPALDING LLP
contact info
Alexander Kazam
KING & SPALDING LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Chad Golder
AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION
contact info
Geoffrey Drake
KING & SPALDING LLP
contact info
Jeffrey S. Bucholtz
KING & SPALDING LLP
contact info
Alexander Kazam
KING & SPALDING LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Bucholtz
KING & SPALDING LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
ILLINOIS STATE MEDICAL SOCIETY
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Bucholtz
KING & SPALDING LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
PUBLIC CITIZEN
Represented By
Scott L. Nelson
PUBLIC CITIZEN LITIGATION GROUP
contact info
Michael T. Kirkpatrick
PUBLIC CITIZEN LITIGATION GROUP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
PETERSEN HEALTH OPERATIONS, LLC, an Illinois Limited Liability Corporation doing business as BLOOMINGTON REHABILITATION & HEALTH CARE CENTER
Represented By
Peter W. Brandt
LIVINGSTON BARGER BRANDT & SCHROEDER
contact info
Joseph R. Wetzel
LIVINGSTON BARGER BRANDT & SCHROEDER
contact info
Richard E. Stites
LIVINGSTON BARGER BRANDT & SCHROEDER
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ANITA MARTIN, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of Marlene Hill, deceased
Represented By
Bryan A. Ruggiero
LEVIN & PERCONTI
contact info
Megan M. Shore
LEVIN & PERCONTI
contact info
Robert S. Peck
CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL LITIGATION P.C.
contact info

GPO Jun 15 2022
Filed opinion of the court by Judge Easterbrook. AFFIRMED. Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge; Amy J. St. Eve, Circuit Judge and Candace Jackson-Akiwumi, Circuit Judge. [7242717-1] [7242717] [21-2959]

Docket last updated: 06/16/2022 3:28 AM CDT
Monday, October 25, 2021
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 11/08/2021. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/06/2021 for Petersen Health Operations, LLC. [1] [7194465] 21-2959 (CG) [Entered: 10/26/2021 09:25 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 38 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court