Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:James L Graham
Referred: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Case #: 2:21-cv-05133
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause49:1903 Petition to enforce administrative summon
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2021
Terminated:Jan 06, 2023
Last checked: Monday Apr 25, 2022 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Midpoint Management Group, LLC
Christopher Qualls, Agent of Service 8411 Morris Rd.
Hilliard, OH 43026
Plaintiff
Secretary of Labor Martin J Walsh
US DOL, Office of the Solicitor 618 Church Street, Suite 230
Nashville, TN 37219
Represented By
LaTasha T Thomas
U.S. Department Of Labor
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 06, 2023
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 01/06 10:04 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (ds)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment Thu 01/13 12:05 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Enforce Judgment. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 1/13/22. (ds)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
5 5 motion Enforce Judgment Wed 01/05 4:58 PM
MOTION to Enforce Judgment Motion for Order Granting Petition For Enforcement of Administrative Subpoena Duces Tecum by Plaintiff Martin J Walsh. (Thomas, LaTasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 08, 2021
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/08 4:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Midpoint Management Group, LLC. Midpoint Management Group, LLC served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Thomas, LaTasha)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 10/29 3:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Midpoint Management Group, LLC. (er)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 10/29 10:18 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 10/29/21. (ds)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/27 2:26 PM
COMPLAINT Petition to Enforce Administrative Subpoena Duces Tecum against Midpoint Management Group, LLC, filed by Martin J Walsh. (Thomas, LaTasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Declaration and Exhibits,
Att: 4 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 5 Summons Form