United States Trustee v. Royal Legal Group, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:21-bk-10576
Lead BK case is: 6:21-bk-10576
Kansas Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mitchell L Herren |
Case #: | 6:21-ap-05036 |
Nature of Suit | 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 27, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Royal Legal Group, LLC
7500 College Blvd, 5th floor
Overland Park, KS 66210 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States Trustee
301 North Main, Suite 1150
Wichita, KS 67202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/17/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 24, 2023 | ||
utility
Flags Set-Reset
Thu 08/24 4:39 PM
Do Not close Flag Terminated. Satisfaction of Judgment has been filed. (wdd) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 08/24 4:46 PM
Adversary Case 6:21-ap-5036 Closed . (wdd) |
||
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Wed 08/23 10:07 AM
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Richard A Kear on behalf of United States Trustee . (Kear, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment
Wed 08/02 3:39 PM
Judgment Signed on 8/2/2023 (waa) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Judgment
Tue 08/01 1:46 PM
Stipulated Judgment Signed on 8/1/2023 (waa) |
|
Friday, December 17, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
order
Generic
Fri 12/17 2:57 PM
Order For Procedural Consolidation Re: Adversary case 21-05036 Complaint by Richard A Kear on behalf of United States Trustee against Royal Legal Group, LLC. Receipt Number Waived, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)) filed by Plaintiff United States Trustee Signed on 12/17/2021 (wdd) |
|
Thursday, December 16, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
court
Courtroom Minute Sheet
Thu 12/16 4:36 PM
Courtroom Minute Sheet (MLH), Ruling: The Court will prepare a case management order that will procedurally consolidate all the cases with 21-5032 being the lead adversary. Counsel are to use the Wichita, Chapter 7 docket calendar when setting hearings. A consolidated Pro Hac Vice Order may be submitted in the lead adversary for all cases. The Court will prepare a Scheduling Order that will set out the deadlines contained within the 26f report or agreed upon at this hearing. Counsel are to submit an Agreed Protective Order by 1/14/22., Hearing Held . (waa) |
|
Friday, December 10, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Fri 12/10 2:29 PM
Report of Parties Planning Meeting Filed by Plaintiff United States Trustee. (Kear, Richard) |
|
Thursday, December 02, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 12/02 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 12/02/2021. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 12/02 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 12/02/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, December 01, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 12/01 4:25 PM
Answer to Complaint with Certificate of Service Filed by Royal Legal Group, LLC . (Schaffer, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, November 30, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
order
Generic
Tue 11/30 4:24 PM
ORDER REGARDING STATUS CONFERENCE ON DECEMBER 16, 2021 Re:1 Adversary case 21-05036 Complaint by Richard A Kear on behalf of United States Trustee against Royal Legal Group, LLC. Receipt Number Waived, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)) filed by Plaintiff United States Trustee Signed on 11/30/2021 (wdd) |
|
5 | 5
court
Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)
Tue 11/30 2:02 PM
Clerk's Notice of Hearing . Status hearing to be held on 12/16/2021 at 10:30 AM at Wichita Courtroom 150. (wdd) |
|
Monday, November 01, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 11/01 9:35 AM
Summons Service Executed on Royal Legal Group, LLC 10/29/2021 (Kear, Richard) |
|
Thursday, October 28, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Thu 10/28 9:09 AM
Summons Issued on Royal Legal Group, LLC Date Issued 10/28/2021, Answer Due 11/29/2021 . (wdd) |
|
Wednesday, October 27, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons Request
Wed 10/27 10:35 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons(es) by Richard A Kear on behalf of United States Trustee - summons(es) requested on Royal Legal Group, LLC (Kear, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/27 10:34 AM
Adversary case 21-05036 Complaint by Richard A Kear on behalf of United States Trustee against Royal Legal Group, LLC. Receipt Number Waived, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)) (Kear, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - contract | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Election of Services | ||
Att: 3 Adversary coversheet |