New Jersey District Court
Judge:Georgette Castner
Referred: Justin T Quinn
Case #: 3:21-cv-19364
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2021
Re-opened:Apr 17, 2024
Terminated:Oct 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 25, 2022 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
FCA US LLC
Represented By
JAMES SIMON COONS
Ansa Assuncao, LLP
contact info
Defendant
STELLANTIS N.V.
Notice Only
PHV JASON H. ALPERSTEIN
Notice Only
PHV THOMAS AZAR, JR
Notice Only
PHV STEPHEN A. D'AUNOY
Notice Only
PHV SCOTT H. MORGAN
Plaintiff
KIMBERLY ENRIGHT
Represented By
PETER A. MUHIC
Berger Montague, PC
contact info

GPO Oct 24 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION Filed. Signed by Judge Georgette Castner on 10/23/2024. (jal, )

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, November 25, 2024
76 76 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing (Case No & Mgr Assigned) Mon 11/25 12:46 PM
USCA Case Number 24-3202 for75 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by KIMBERLY ENRIGHT, AMY ARROYO, MICHAEL BENT, WILLIAM DEMOLA, BCR CARPENTRY LLC. USCA Case Manager Kirsi (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3gch)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
75 75 appeal Notice of Appeal (USCA Philadelphia) Fri 11/22 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by KIMBERLY ENRIGHT, AMY ARROYO, WILLIAM DEMOLA, MICHAEL BENT, BCR CARPENTRY LLC. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ANJDC-15827023. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]